California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00414
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 1:10 AM PDT
Defendant
Casey Robert Goonan (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nikhil Bhagat
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jul 18 2024
Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Casey Robert Goonan.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/18/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2024)[4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
GPO Jul 26 2024
Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Casey Robert Goonan. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/26/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2024)

Docket last updated: 02/24/2025 2:45 AM PST
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT as to Casey Robert Goonan (1). (cjl, COURT STAFF) [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
2 2 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET ENTRY 3 *** Motion for Sealing Order and Order to Seal Case as to Casey Robert Goonan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on June 26, 2024. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 6/27/2024 (cjl, COURT STAFF). [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion for Sealing Order and Order Granting Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on June 26, 2024. (cjl, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/15/2024 (jlm, COURT STAFF). [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
Set Hearing as to Defendant Casey Robert Goonan per AUSA Nikhil Bhagat re1 Complaint: Initial Appearance and I.D. of Counsel Hearing set for 7/11/2024 10:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (ig, COURT STAFF) [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Appearance as to Casey Robert Goonan held on 7/11/2024. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. ID of Counsel Hearing as to Casey Robert Goonan held on 7/11/2024. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 7/18/2024 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Status re Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment and Detention Hearing set for 7/18/2024 at 10:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Entire case ordered unsealed. DPPA advisement. (Liberty Digital Recording: 10:34-10:46). (jlm, COURT STAFF) Modified on 7/12/2024 (jlm, COURT STAFF). [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 NO BAIL Warrant Returned Executed on 07/11/2024 as to Casey Robert Goonan. (jlm, COURT STAFF) [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
7 7 Letter from Assistant U.S. Attorney Nikhil Bhagat to Hon. Donna M. Ryu as to Casey Robert Goonan (Bhagat, Nikhil) [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Status re Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment and Detention Hearing as to Casey Robert Goonan held on 7/18/2024. Motion for Detention Hearing WAIVED. Defendant Ordered DETAINED. Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Casey Robert Goonan held on 7/18/2024. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 7/26/2024 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Status re Preliminary Hearing/Arraignment set for 7/26/2024 at 10:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Defendant remanded to custody. (Liberty Digital Recording: 10:34-10:39). (jlm, COURT STAFF) [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
10 10 Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Casey Robert Goonan.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/18/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) [4:24-mj-70948-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 INDICTMENT as to Casey Robert Goonan (1), on Count(s): 1, 2 and 3. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet