Vermont District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00082
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 26, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Xavier Parker (1)
Represented By
Chandler W. Matson, Esq.
Barr Law Group, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicole P. Cate, AUSA
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/26/2024 4:43 AM EDT
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
CJA 20: Appointment of Chandler W. Matson, Esq for Xavier Parker. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/16/2024. (law) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
6 6 REDACTED COMPLAINT as to Xavier Parker. Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 6/3/2024. (hbc) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/24/2024) (hbc). [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Scott Labor
7 7 MOTION for Detention with Request for Oral Argument/Hearing by USA as to Xavier Parker. (drg) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
8 8 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED executed on 7/16/2024 as to Xavier Parker.(drg) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/17/2024) (drg). [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION as to Xavier Parker re:8 Warrant Returned Executed. Document replaced to redact codefendant's name. Corrected document also attached to this entry. (drg) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
10 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Kevin J. Doyle: Initial Appearance as to Xavier Parker (1) held on 7/17/2024. Present are AUSA Nicole Cate for the gov't, Atty Chandler Matson w/ deft, and M. Perez for the USPO. Court informs deft of rights. Financial affidavit reviewed. Court makes inquiries and informs deft of the Complaint. Gov't moves for detention and deft does not object at this time. ORAL ORDER: Consistent with Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f), Court confirms disclosure obligation of the prosecutor under Brady v. Maryland and possible consequences of violating such Order. ORDERED: Court appoints counsel on behalf of deft.7 MOTION for Detention is granted as unopposed. Deft to be detained pending further proceedings. Deft also detained in 2:18-cr-140-2. Preliminary Hearing set for 7/31/2024 at 1:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (Court Reporter: Recorded) (hbc) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
11 11 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit as to Xavier Parker (1). (Document image is sealed) (hbc) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Xavier Parker (1). Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 7/17/2024. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION (unopposed) as to Xavier Parker (1). Signed by Judge Kevin J. Doyle on 7/17/2024. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
14 14 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Xavier Parker (1): Preliminary Hearing or Arraignment set for 7/31/2024 at 1:00 PM in Burlington Courtroom 410 before Judge Kevin J. Doyle. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
15 15 NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION as to Xavier Parker re:6 Redacted Complaint. The main document has been replaced to include the filed stamp. The corrected image is attached to6 as well as to this entry. (hbc) [2:24-mj-00065-kjd]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
19 19 REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Xavier Parker. (law)
Related: [-]