Original Case: 1:17-cv-02398

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvus-05177
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 7:05 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Antony J. Blinken, Secretary of State, U.S. Department of State
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Marco Rubio, Secretary of State, U.S. Department of State
Represented By
Anna Davis Walker
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Timothy C. Fitzgerald
Represented By
Tamara Leora Slater
Alan Lescht & Associates, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 7:05 AM EDT
Thursday, July 25, 2024
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-5177
Related: [-]
30+ pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2066369] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02398-RBW filed by Timothy C. Fitzgerald. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5177 24-5177
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2066404] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/26/2024. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/09/2024. APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/26/2024. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/26/2024. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/26/2024. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/09/2024 24-5177
Related: [-]