Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Mark S Norris
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:24-cv-02530
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 3:43 AM CST
Defendant
Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By
Paul E. Prather
Littler Mendelson, PLC
contact info
Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawn Thomas
Represented By
Dan M. Norwood
Norwood & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion to Extend Deadline Fri 04/25 11:00 AM
[**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING 18 JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE . The parties seek to extend the ADR deadline in this matter because a medical issue of counsel prevented them from completing sufficient discovery before the current deadline. The Court finds the motion well taken, and it is GRANTED . The parties shall have up to and including June 17, 2025 , to attend mediation in this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 4/25/2025. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
18 18 motion Extend Deadline Thu 04/24 8:07 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline to Complete ADR, proposed order submitted by Medtronic, Inc.. (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 02/24 11:37 AM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Mediator by Medtronic, Inc.. (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/31 9:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER . Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 1/31/2025. (Norris, Mark)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Setting Letter Fri 01/31 9:30 AM
SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Tuesday, 01/20/2026 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 01/09/2026 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 01/02/2026. (zsf)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 01/31 9:28 AM
MINUTES: Scheduling Conference held via Microsoft Teams Video on 01/31/2025 before Judge Mark S. Norris. Atty Dan M. Norwood appeared (via telephone) for the plaintiff; Atty Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen appeared for the defendant; proposed scheduling order adopted. The following deadlines/schedules were established: Jury Trial set Tuesday, 01/20/2026 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris (estimated 3-4 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 01/09/2026 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris; Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due 01/02/2026. Scheduling Order to enter. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (zsf)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 01/13 10:47 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
12 12 notice Setting Letter - Teams Mon 11/04 11:18 AM
SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 01/31/2025 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mark S. Norris. The proceeding will be held via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding. Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding. The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: [LINK:https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings] The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated. Parties should consult the instructions for [LINK:Joining a Meeting in Teams] or [LINK:Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account] . (zsf)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
11 11 utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/01 4:01 PM
Judge Mark S. Norris added. (jae)
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 11/01 2:48 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 11/1/2024. (Parker, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/01 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen on behalf of Medtronic, Inc. (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/01 11:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medtronic, Inc.. (Prather, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/01 11:16 AM
Medtronic, Inc.'s ANSWER to1 Complaint by Medtronic, Inc..(Prather, Paul)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 15, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 09/15 11:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shawn Thomas. Medtronic, Inc. waiver sent on 9/3/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. (Norwood, Dan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Fri 07/26 8:29 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (mf)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Fri 07/26 8:29 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice ADR Compliance Fri 07/26 8:28 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 07/26 8:27 AM
Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (mf)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 3:03 AM
COMPLAINT against Medtronic, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4467708), filed by Shawn Thomas.(Norwood, Dan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet