Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery W Cavender
Case #: 1:24-bk-57695
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Apr 30, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pine Tree Condominium Association, Inc.
5900 Windward Pkwy Ste 390
Alpharetta, GA 30005-5479
Represented By
Mark Gensburg
Jones & Walden LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
84 84 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Sat 05/03 12:54 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
83 83 misc Certificate of Mailing of Notice of Order Confirming Plan (11c) Sat 05/03 12:54 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Order Confirming Plan. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
82 82 misc 0-Certificate of Service Thu 05/01 10:25 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Confirming Plan Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1191(a) filed by Mark Gensburg on behalf of Pine Tree Condominium Association, Inc.. Related [+] (Gensburg, Mark)
Related: [-] 80
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
81 81 order Notice of Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Wed 04/30 3:26 PM
Notice of Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan. Service by BNC (cws)
Related: [-]
80 80 7 pgs order Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Wed 04/30 3:25 PM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1191(a). Service by Counsel for Debtor. Entered on 4/30/2025. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 78
Friday, April 25, 2025
79 79 misc 0-Certificate of Service Fri 04/25 4:25 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service of Third Modification to Plan of Reorganization filed by Mark Gensburg on behalf of Pine Tree Condominium Association, Inc.. Related [+] (Gensburg, Mark)
Related: [-] 78
78 78 plan Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Fri 04/25 8:05 AM
Amended Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of Pine Tree Condominium Association, Inc.. (McCord, Cameron)
Related: [-]