Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:23-bk-50463

North Carolina Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Lena M James
Case #: 6:24-ap-06010
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Bankruptcy Administrator
John Paul Hughes Cournoyer
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator 101 South Edgeworth Street
Greensboro, NC 27401
Defendant
Global Lending Services LLC
1200 Brookfield Blvd Ste 300
Greenville, SC 29607
Represented By
Global Lending Services LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Brandi Richardson
Chapter 13 Office PO Box 2115
Winston Salem, NC 27102
Represented By
Vernon J. Cahoon
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 11/05 3:44 PM
Disposition of Adversary 6:24-ap-6010 Consent Judgment For Trustee, Brandi L Richardson (Randolph, T.)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/05 3:47 PM
Adversary Case 6:24-ap-6010 Closed (Randolph, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/21 11:01 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Brandi Richardson Related [+]. (Cahoon, Vernon)
Related: [-] 8 Judgment
Saturday, October 19, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 10/20 12:36 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 10/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Judgment
Thursday, October 17, 2024
8 8 order Judgment Thu 10/17 5:00 PM
Consent Judgment. Related [+]. (Randolph, T.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brandi Richardson
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/29 12:37 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 08/27 12:30 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled 11/6/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Randolph, T.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brandi Richardson
Monday, August 26, 2024
6 6 order Extend Time Mon 08/26 4:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time up to and including September 24, 2024 to file an answer or otherwise plead Related [+] (Randolph, T.)
Related: [-] 5
Thursday, August 22, 2024
5 5 motion Extend Time Thu 08/22 4:16 PM
First Motion to Extend Time to to file answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by Global Lending Services LLC (Fletcher, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 07/30 1:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Global Lending Services LLC 7/30/2024 . Related [+]. (Cahoon, Vernon)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued on Global Lending Services LLC Date Issued 7/26/2024, Answer Due 8/25/2024 Scheduling Memorandum Due: 09/25/24 Summons service due 8/2/2024. (Randolph, T.)
Monday, July 29, 2024
crditcrd none Mon 07/29 8:52 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 24-06010 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 50102996, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (Kiser)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Saturday, July 27, 2024
3 3 court AP Memo Sat 07/27 2:28 AM
AP Memo - Instructions and Information for Pretrial Scheduling Memorandum. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 07/26 2:11 PM
Summons Issued on Global Lending Services LLC Date Issued 7/26/2024, Answer Due 8/25/2024 Scheduling Memorandum Due: 09/25/24 Summons service due 8/2/2024. (Randolph, T.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 8:17 AM
Adversary case 24-06010 12 Related [+] : Complaint by Brandi Richardson against Global Lending Services LLC Fee Amount $350. (Cahoon, Vernon)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preference
court Hearing Set (Other) Fri 07/26 2:12 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing Set Related [+] Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled 10/2/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom, Winston-Salem. (Randolph, T.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brandi Richardson