Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Referred: Susan Prose
Case #: 1:24-cv-02061
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 10, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 2:26 AM MST
Defendant
Sedgwick County
Represented By
Leslie L. Schluter
Dagner Schluter Werber LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathon Nadow
28285 WCR 20
Keenesburg, CO 80643
Represented By
Christopher M.A. Lujan
Empower P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 02/10 9:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting24 Stipulation of Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 2/10/25. Text Only Entry(jdyne)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
24 24 motion Dismiss Fri 02/07 9:03 PM
Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Plaintiff Nathon Nadow. (Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
23 23 1 pgs minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 01/17 8:39 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for Settlement Conference held on 1/16/2025 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. A Settlement was reached as to all claims and parties. The parties shall file dismissal papers on or before February 18, 2025 . (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
22 22 order Minute Order Fri 12/06 2:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/06/2024: The Parties are advised that the courtroom and chambers of Magistrate Judge Susan Prose will be relocated to Courtroom A502 on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver Colorado effective December 11, 2024. Accordingly, the Settlement Conference set for January 16, 2025, as well as all other settings unless otherwise ordered, will be held in Courtroom A-502 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall please check in with the courtroom deputy in the courtroom. Plaintiff(s) shall arrive at 9:15 a.m. Defendant(s) shall arrive at 9:30 a.m. All counsel and parties shall attend in person. Text Only Entry (sjeff)
Related: [-]
21 21 29 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/06 9:28 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Sedgwick County, filed by Nathon Nadow.(Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
20 20 order Order Wed 12/04 9:15 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 12/4/2024, re:19 Notice of Filing Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a clean version of the amended complaint by 12/9/2024. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
19 19 misc Notice of Filing Amended Pleading Fri 11/29 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Plaintiff Nathon Nadow(Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint and Jury Demand
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
18 18 order Minute Order Wed 11/20 9:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/29/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 10/22/2025. In addition to filing, the parties are directed to email the proposed order in editable format to Sweeney_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 11/20/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
17 17 order Order Wed 11/13 10:51 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on November 13, 2024. A Settlement Conference is set for January 16, 2025 in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall please check in with the courtroom deputy in the courtroom. Plaintiff(s) shall arrive at 9:15 a.m. Defendant(s) shall arrive at 9:30 a.m. All counsel and parties shall attend in person Settlement statements are due (by email to prose_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) no later than five (5) business days prior. Please see the Uniform Civil Practice Standards of the United States Magistrate Judges (available on the courts website) at pp. 21-23, including for Proses specific requirements for settlement statements. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 11/13 10:04 AM
DISREGARD - ENTERED IN INCORRECT CASE COURTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 11/13/2024. FTR: Courtroom C205. (sjeff) Modified on 11/13/2024 (sjeff, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/12 1:27 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 11/12/2024. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 11/12 1:24 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 11/12/2024. For the reasons stated on the record, it is ORDERED : The parties shall confer regarding availability of all parties and send a joint email to chambers requesting the setting of a settlement conference. Scheduling order entered. FTR: Courtroom C205. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 11/12 8:53 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Nathon Nadow. Docketed by clerk as a courtesy to the parties, at the request of Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. (sjeff)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/06 4:53 PM
STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 11/06/2024. This Stipulated Order shall be interpreted to provide the maximum protection allowed by Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Nothing contained herein is intended to or shall serve to limit a party's right to conduct a review of documents, ESI or information (including metadata) for relevance, responsiveness and/or segregation of privileged and/or protected information before production. (jrobe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
11 11 3 pgs misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 10/02 4:59 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Sedgwick County All parties do not consent.. (Schluter, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
10 10 order Order Mon 09/30 10:05 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 9/30/2024. On the parties' request, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 11/12/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/5/2024. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
9 9 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/30 6:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Sedgwick County.(Schluter, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order Wed 08/28 4:40 PM
ORDER SETTING CONSENT DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 8/28/2024. Complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form on or before October 2, 2024. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on October 16, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. , in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint Tue 08/27 4:14 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint Under Local Rule 6.1 by Defendant Sedgwick County. Sedgwick County answer due 8/30/2024. (Schluter, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 08/12 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Leslie L. Schluter on behalf of Sedgwick CountyAttorney Leslie L. Schluter added to party Sedgwick County(pty:dft) (Schluter, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 08/07 4:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathon Nadow. Sedgwick County served on 8/6/2024, answer due 8/27/2024. (Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/29 1:58 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 7/29/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 07/26 4:32 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (agryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 07/26 4:30 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 1:00 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Sedgwick County, Board of County Commissioners (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9793838)Attorney Christopher M.A. Lujan added to party Nathon Nadow(pty:pla), filed by Nathon Nadow.(Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet