Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah K Chasanow
Case #: 8:24-cv-02171
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 4:32 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Julio A. Llovet
Represented By
Jon Dennis Pels
The Pels Law Firm
contact info
Alvaro Augusto Llosa
The Pels Law Firm
contact info
Counter Claimant
Walnut Packaging Inc.
Represented By
Lee Bryan Rauch
Funk & Bolton, P.A.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc.
Represented By
Bruce L Marcus
Marcus Bonsib LLC
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Coleman
Marcus Bonsib LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Julio A. Llovet
Represented By
Jon Dennis Pels
The Pels Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Julio A. Llovet
Represented By
Stephen Stine
The Stine Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Jon Dennis Pels
The Pels Law Firm
contact info
Alvaro Augusto Llosa
The Pels Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Walnut Packaging Inc.
Represented By
Lee Bryan Rauch
Funk & Bolton, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc.
Represented By
Bruce L Marcus
Marcus Bonsib LLC
contact info
Megan Elizabeth Coleman
Marcus Bonsib LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
26 26 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 02/27 8:55 AM
QC NOTICE:25 Certificate of Service filed by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Noncompliance with Local Rule 104.5 - Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, written discovery requests, responses thereto, notices of service of discovery requests or responses, depositions, and disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) (1) and (2) shall not be filed with the Court. The party propounding written discovery or taking a deposition shall be responsible for retaining the original copies of the discovery materials (including the certificates of service) and shall make them available for inspection by any other party. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
25 25 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/26 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc. (Marcus, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
23 23 corresp Status Report Submitted Wed 10/23 3:16 PM
Status Report Submitted Joint Report Regarding Scheduling Order by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc. (Coleman, Megan)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 10/23 5:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER THANKING the parties for23 joint initial report and APPROVING the parties' request to extend the Scheduling Order deadlines. Discovery closes and a status report is due by 5/22/2025; the dispositive motions deadline is 6/23/2025. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/23/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/09 12:40 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery closes and a status report is due by 2/21/2025; the dispositive motions deadline is 3/24/2025. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/9/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Counterclaim Tue 10/08 3:00 PM
Gold Crust ANSWER to20 Counterclaim Llovet First Amended Counterclaim by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc..(Coleman, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
20 20 cmp Counterclaim Mon 10/07 9:54 PM
Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc., filed by Julio A. Llovet.(Llosa, Alvaro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redline
Friday, September 27, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/27 4:52 PM
NOTICE by Julio A. Llovet re18 Order, (Llosa, Alvaro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Thu 09/26 10:14 AM
LETTER/ORDER CONFIRMING the matters discussed and schedule set during the telephone conference. Bakery Process Solutions, Inc. intends to file a motion to intervene, and will do so by September 27, 2024. Any opposition will be filed by October 11, 2024, and any reply is due by October 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/26/2024. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 09/26 9:54 AM
Telephone Conference held on 9/26/2024 before Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 11:53 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Stephen Stine. Directing attorney Stephen Stine to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 9/25/2024. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/24 2:11 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen Stine (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-11507674.) by Julio A. Llovet(Llosa, Alvaro)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/24 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alvaro Augusto Llosa on behalf of Julio A. Llovet (Llosa, Alvaro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/19 12:28 PM
NOTICE: The status of Bakery Process Solutions, Inc. will be discussed during the telephone conference with counsel scheduled September 26, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/19 11:39 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE SCHEDULING a telephone conference with counsel on Thursday, September 26, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel. (sat, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 09/16 3:47 PM
Gold Crust ANSWER to12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Julio Llovet by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc..(Coleman, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 08/26 3:57 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Julio A. Llovet by Julio A. Llovet.(Pels, Jon)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Local Rule Mon 08/26 11:46 AM
Local Rule 103(5)(Rauch, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Line of Appearance for Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Attachment Writ of Summons as to Llovet,
Att: 3 Attachment Writ of Summons as to Walnut Packaging,
Att: 4 Attachment State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Attachment Circuit Court Docket Report
Friday, August 23, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Counterclaim Fri 08/23 10:21 AM
Gold Crust ANSWER to5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim WPI Counterclaim by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc..(Coleman, Megan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Mon 08/19 3:57 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Julio A. Llovet.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 08/19 2:25 PM
NOTICE by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc. Request for Issuance of Summons for Original Process of Julio A. Llovet(Coleman, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons in a Civil Action
Friday, August 09, 2024
7 7 respm Response Fri 08/09 1:03 PM
RESPONSE re4 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Walnut Packaging Inc..(Rauch, Lee)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
6 6 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 08/05 1:11 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc. (Coleman, Megan)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 08/02 12:33 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc. by Walnut Packaging Inc..(Rauch, Lee)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 4 notice Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Mon 07/29 10:14 AM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 07/29 9:55 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Julio A. Llovet, Walnut Packaging Inc., filed by Gold Crust Baking Company, Inc. (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 07/26 2:57 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walnut Packaging Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walnut Packaging Inc. for Walnut Packaging Inc..(Rauch, Lee)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 07/26 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number C-16-CV-24-002754. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11396740), filed by Walnut Packaging Inc..(Rauch, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
utility Remark - State Court Docs Mon 07/29 10:13 AM
THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]