California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-06333
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 1:32 AM PST
Defendant
Derma E
Defendant
Topix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant
Topix Skin Health, Inc.
Plaintiff
Prisha Cosmetics
Represented By
Anthony H Son
Adli Law Group PC
contact info
Dariush G. Adli
Adli Law Group P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, January 17, 2025
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 01/17 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Son, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 12/19 10:47 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Court is in receipt of the Notice18 filed by Plaintiff to the Court's Order to Show Case. The Court EXTENDS the Order to Show Cause to January 17, 2025, for Plaintiff to file a notice of dismissal or, in the event that the parties are unable to reach an agreement, plaintiff will take other action as appropriate, including filing a Motion for Entry of Default Judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b) if necessary. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 12/17 10:54 AM
Notice filed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics. In Response to OSC (Son, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 12/11 9:08 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 12/17/2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 10/15 6:40 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendants Topix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Derma E., Topix Skin Health, Inc. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
15 15 motion Clerk to Enter Default Mon 10/14 3:03 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendants All Defendants filed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics. Request set for hearing on 11/15/2024 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Son, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Anthony Son Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Son Declaration
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 09/04 1:10 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics.(Son, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 08/21 3:37 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics, upon Defendant Topix Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Process Specialist/Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Adli, Dariush)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 08/21 3:28 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant Prisha Cosmetics, upon Defendant Topix Skin Health, Inc. served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Process Specialist/Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Adli, Dariush)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 08/21 3:23 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics, upon Defendant Derma E served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Process Specialist/Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Adli, Dariush)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 08/06 1:18 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (cr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/29 10:01 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Derma E, Topix Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Topix Skin Health, Inc. (ghap)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 07/29 9:18 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 07/29 9:18 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 07/29 9:17 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 07/29 7:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anthony H Son on behalf of Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics (Attorney Anthony H Son added to party Prisha Cosmetics(pty:pla))(Son, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 07/26 12:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics. (Adli, Dariush)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 07/26 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics, identifying Brenda Wu, CEO of Topix Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Adli, Dariush)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 07/26 12:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics. (Adli, Dariush)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/26 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37908422 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Prisha Cosmetics. (Attorney Dariush G. Adli added to party Prisha Cosmetics(pty:pla))(Adli, Dariush)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E