New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 6:24-cv-00927
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Board of Education of the Poland Central School District
Represented By
Charles E. Symons
Ferrara Fiorenza P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Gregory Cuthbertson
Represented By
Charles E. Symons
Ferrara Fiorenza P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Laura Dutton
Represented By
Charles E. Symons
Ferrara Fiorenza P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Poland Central School District
Represented By
Charles E. Symons
Ferrara Fiorenza P.C.
contact info
Mediator (Mandatory Program)
Ira B. Lobel
Represented By
Ira B. Lobel
contact info
Plaintiff
Saraiya Wierzbicki
Represented By
Melanie J. Lazarus
Harding Mazzotti, LLP
contact info
Kelly A. Magnuson
Harding Mazzotti, Llp - Albany Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
23 23 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/25 11:54 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 4/25/2025. (nmk)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/25 11:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Saraiya Wierzbicki submitted to Judge Brenda Sannes. (Lazarus, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 04/15 11:32 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT: This action is dismissed in its entirety, without costs, and without prejudice to the right of any party to reopen this action within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. The dismissal shall become with prejudice on the thirty-first day following the date of this Order, unless any party moves to reopen this case within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order upon a showing that the settlement was not consummated, or the Court extends the thirty (30) day period prior to its expiration. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 4/15/2025. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/09 4:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Board of Education of the Poland Central School District, Gregory Cuthbertson, Laura Dutton, Ira B. Lobel, Poland Central School District submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes. (Symons, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 adr Report of Mandatory Mediation Mon 03/24 1:13 PM
REPORT OF MANDATORY MEDIATION - A Mandatory Mediation session was held on 2/19. Total Hours Spent by Mediator: 8; The outcome of Mandatory Mediation is: CASE HAS SETTLED. The Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Dismissal are being prepared and will be submitted for the courts consideration. (Lobel, Ira)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
18 18 order Order Tue 03/11 5:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: In light of the 17 Report of Mandatory Mediation advising that a settlement was reached in this matter, counsel are directed to submit a stipulation of dismissal by 4/10/2025. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 3/11/2025. (nmk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
adr ADR Completed Mon 03/10 7:58 AM
ADR COMPLETED - CASE HAS SETTLED. Mediator Ira B. Lobel terminated. The mediator and attorneys who attended the mediation session are asked to complete a survey with respect to the Mandatory Mediation Program. Attorneys for parties can access the survey at https://forms.office.com/g/AGz4E8EBVa. Mediators can access the survey at https://forms.office.com/g/pfQiD2e4jy. Any questions can be directed to the ADR Coordinator.(amt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 adr Report of Mandatory Mediation Fri 03/07 3:11 PM
REPORT OF MANDATORY MEDIATION - A Mandatory Mediation session was held on 2/9/2024. Total Hours Spent by Mediator: 8 1/2; The outcome of Mandatory Mediation is: CASE HAS SETTLED. The Settlement Agreement and Stipulation for Dismissal are being prepared and will be submitted for the courts consideration. (Lobel, Ira)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
notice Notice - Other Mon 03/03 11:07 AM
TEXT NOTICE: Pursuant to General Order #47, a mediator's report must be filed within seven (7) days after the close of each mediation session. This report should be electronically filed by using the event "Civil Events/Mediation Documents/Report of Mandatory Mediation." The court ordered deadline for the parties to complete mandatory mediation in this action expired on 2/21/2025. See Dkt. No.13 . If the parties did not complete mandatory mediation, then a status report and/or request for an extension of the deadline must be filed within seven (7) days of today's date. (amt)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/03 11:46 AM
TEXT ORDER: On or before 4/17/2025, the parties shall file next status reports regarding the progress of discovery and the litigation. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/3/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 02/03 11:45 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: a status conference was held on 2/3/2025, via Teams teleconference. The Court reminded the parties as to the deadlines and schedules as set forth in Dkt. Nos. 12 & 13. The parties advised as to the progress of discovery and the litigation. The parties shall file next status reports by 4/17/2025. Appearances: M. Lazarus, Esq., for the Plaintiff; and C. Symons, Esq., for the Defendants. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 misc Status Report Thu 01/23 3:27 PM
STATUS REPORT by Saraiya Wierzbicki. (Lazarus, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
14 14 adr Stipulation Selecting Mediator Tue 11/26 10:12 AM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Ira Lobel has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Melanie J. Lazarus and Charles Symons. Dated: 11/22/24(Lazarus, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Wed 10/30 12:17 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 11/27/2024. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 2/21/2025.Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/30/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
12 12 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Wed 10/30 12:17 PM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 8. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2025. Discovery due by 7/14/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 4/15/2025. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 5/30/2025. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 6/16/2025. Motions to be filed by 9/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/30/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/30 12:06 PM
TEXT ORDER: On or before 1/23/2025, the parties shall file status reports regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 2/3/2025 at 11:00AM, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/30/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 10/30 12:05 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: an initial conference was held on 10/30/2024. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. A telephone conference is scheduled for 2/3/2025 at 11:00AM, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. Appearances: M. Lazarus, Esq. for the Plaintiff and C. Symons, Esq. for the Defendants. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
10 10 misc Civil Case Management Plan Wed 10/23 6:49 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Saraiya Wierzbicki. (Lazarus, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/21 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melanie J. Lazarus on behalf of Saraiya Wierzbicki (Lazarus, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/07 4:32 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Board of Education of the Poland Central School District, Gregory Cuthbertson, Laura Dutton, Poland Central School District.(Symons, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 09/24 11:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, General Order #25, and all ECF notices served on Gregory Cuthbertson on 09/19/2024, filed by Saraiya Wierzbicki. (Magnuson, Kelly)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Tue 09/24 11:36 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, General Order #25, and all ECF notices served on Poland Central School District on 09/17/2024, filed by Saraiya Wierzbicki. (Magnuson, Kelly)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 09/24 11:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, General Order #25, and all ECF notices served on Board of Education of the Poland Central School District on 09/17/2024, filed by Saraiya Wierzbicki. (Magnuson, Kelly)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 09/24 11:35 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, General Order #25, and all ECF notices served on Laura Dutton on 09/17/2024, filed by Saraiya Wierzbicki. (Magnuson, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Fri 07/26 11:51 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 10/30/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/23/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (tll)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/26 11:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Poland Central School District, Board of Education of the Poland Central School District, Gregory Cuthbertson, and Laura Dutton.(tll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued for Board of Education of Poland Central School District,
Att: 2 Summons issued for Gregory Cuthbertson,
Att: 3 Summons Issued for Laura Dutton
notice Notice - Other Fri 07/26 1:43 PM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference set for 10/30/2024 at 11:00AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 11:43 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Poland Central School District, Board of Education of the Poland Central School District, Gregory Cuthbertson and Laura Dutton (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6812837) filed by Saraiya Wierzbicki.(tll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet