Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Susie Morgan
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:24-cv-01857
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 2:32 AM CST
Defendant
Hammond City
Represented By
Andre Gerard Coudrain
Cashe Coudrain & Bass
contact info
Maria Nan Alessandra
Phelps Dunbar, Llp (new Orleans)
contact info
Defendant
Unidentified Party
Plaintiff
Jennifer Payne
46506 Pine Hill Court
Hammond, LA 70401
Represented By
Scott Campbell Sledge
Anderson Traylor Edwards
contact info
Ashley Anderson Traylor
Anderson Traylor Edwards
contact info
Christopher J. Edwards, Jr.
Anderson Traylor Edwards
contact info

GPO Feb 19 2025
ORDER AND REASONS granting 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/19/2025. (meb)

Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
39 39 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to Complaint Wed 03/26 4:20 PM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses , ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint, by Hammond City.(Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/05 10:33 AM
ORDER GRANTING37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re22 Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, City of Hammond, has an additional twenty-one (21) days or until and through, March 26, 2025, in which to answer the First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/5/2025. (pp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
37 37 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/27 3:29 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re22 Amended Complaint by Hammond City.(Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
36 36 23 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Wed 02/19 9:53 AM
ORDER AND REASONS granting29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/19/2025. (meb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
35 35 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Tue 02/11 10:07 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re34 Reply to Response to Motion: Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Reply to Response to Motion. Clerk took corrective action. (meb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
34 34 respm Response/Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 02/10 1:11 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Hammond City re29 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages . (Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
33 33 misc Letter Fri 02/07 10:25 AM
Letter re Causes of Action (pp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
32 32 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Wed 02/05 2:18 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference is scheduled for Thursday, October 2, 2025, at 1:30 p.m., before the undersigned magistrate judge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties comply with the attached Settlement Conference Guidelines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 2/5/2025. (rkr) (rkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/5/2025) Settlement Confernce Guidelines
Monday, February 03, 2025
31 31 8 pgs misc Memorandum Mon 02/03 9:07 PM
Memorandum by Jennifer Payne (Traylor, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
30 30 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/30 11:35 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. 3 day Bench Trial set for 11/17/2025 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 9/2/2025.(bwn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
29 29 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Tue 01/21 3:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages by Hammond City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/12/2025.(Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
28 28 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Tue 01/21 3:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages by Hammond City. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/12/2025.(Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
Friday, December 27, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/27 2:07 PM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - The Preliminary Conference currently scheduled for January 9, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, JANUARY 30, 2025, AT 9:30 A.M. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/23 11:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re22 Amended Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, City of Hammond, has an additional twenty-one (21) days or until and through, JJanuary 21, 2025, in which to respond to the22 First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/23/2024. (pp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/20 3:48 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re22 Amended Complaint by Hammond City.(Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
24 24 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 12/20 3:34 PM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - The Preliminary Conference currently scheduled for December 19, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, JANUARY 9, 2025, AT 10:30 A.M. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim Tue 12/17 2:17 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the6 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/17/2024. (pp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/16 5:12 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jennifer Payne.(Traylor, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
21 21 6 pgs order Order Wed 12/04 9:52 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's amended complaint must be filed on or before Monday, December 16th, 2024, at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 12/4/2024.(pp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/15 11:07 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Hammond City re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
19 19 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 11/11 4:34 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Traylor, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Set Hearings Tue 11/05 1:52 PM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 12/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 2:37 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the automatic referral in the above captioned matter is revoked. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 11/4/2024.(pp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Wed 10/30 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF 636(c) NON CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The matter is hereby returned to the docket of the District Judge for the scheduling of a preliminary conference and the selection of discovery cut-off, pre-trial conference, and trial dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 10/30/2024.(rkr) (NEF Section E)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Status Conference Wed 10/30 11:15 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier: Status Conference held on 10/30/2024. The Court was advised that not all parties consent to proceed to trial before a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). (rkr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
14 14 minutes ~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 10/03 8:55 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the12 First MOTION to Continue Submission Date filed by Jennifer Payne is GRANTED and the submission date of Defendant Hammond City's pending6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is hereby continued to November 19, 2024. Any opposition or reply memoranda must be filed in compliance with the deadlines set by Local Rule 7.5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 10/2/2024. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
13 13 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Wed 10/02 11:59 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re12 First MOTION to Continue Submission Date . ** Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
12 12 motion Continue Tue 10/01 11:15 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Continue Submission Date by Jennifer Payne.(Traylor, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order,
Att: 2 Cert. of Service
Friday, September 27, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 09/27 4:40 PM
ORDER RESCHEDULING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference currently set for Tuesday, October 1, 2024, at 9:30 a.m., is hereby RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, October 30, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge. Counsel are to participate in the conference as directed herein. One purpose of the conference is to determine whether all parties consent to proceed before a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). If all parties consent, the attached form is to be circulated, with each party signing the same form, as directed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 9/27/2024. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Proceed Form
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record Fri 09/27 4:23 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the9 Motion to Enroll Counsel is GRANTED and that Ashley Anderson Traylor (La. Bar # 36287), Christopher J. Edwards, Jr. (La. Bar # 35471), and S. Camp Sledge (La Bar # 39506), of the law firm Anderson Traylor Edwards, are hereby enrolled as counsel of record for Plaintiff Jennifer Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 9/27/2024. (rkr)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Enroll as Counsel of Record Fri 09/27 10:30 AM
First MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Jennifer Payne. Motion(s) referred to Eva J. Dossier. Attorney Ashley Anderson Traylor added to party Jennifer Payne(pty:pla).(Traylor, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Fri 09/13 2:27 PM
ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that a preliminary conference is scheduled for Tuesday, October 1, 2024, at 9:30 a.m., before the undersigned magistrate judge. Counsel are to participate in the conference as directed herein.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier on 9/13/2024. (rkr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Proceed Form
7 7 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 09/13 11:04 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.** Filing attorney should have entered Submission Date and selected the correct hearing Judge. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 10/8/2024 before Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. No further action is necessary.** (pp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6) Thu 09/12 3:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hammond City. Motion(s) referred to Eva J. Dossier. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/9/2024.(Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Notice of Submission
Friday, August 23, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/26 2:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hammond City served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 08/20 3:10 PM
ORDER GRANTING3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant City of Hammond to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended twenty-one (21) days, until and through September 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/20/2024. (pp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
3 3 motion Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/19 4:52 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint by Hammond City. Motion(s) referred to Eva J. Dossier.Attorney Maria Nan Alessandra added to party Hammond City(pty:dft).(Alessandra, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 25, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/26 12:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Hammond City. (sdp)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/26 12:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405.00-Receipt No.200008085) filed by Jennifer Payne.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons
misc Filing Fee Received Fri 07/26 12:07 PM
Filing fee received from Jennifer Payne: $ 405.00-Receipt No.200008085. (sdp) Modified date on 7/26/2024 (sdp)
Related: [-]