Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:24-mj-02187
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 28, 2024 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez (1)
Represented By
Nicole Valdes Hardin
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maria Guzman
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/28/2024 4:13 AM EDT
Thursday, July 25, 2024
1 1 Arrest pursuant to Rule 5(c)(2) of Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez from the District of New Mexico. (LV)
Related: [-]
2 2 ***CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez. (LV)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel, ORAL MOTION to Appoint Interpreter by Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez. (LV)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez (1); granting 3 Motion to Appoint Interpreter as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/25/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez. Nicole Valdes Hardin for Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez appointed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/25/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez. (LV)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORAL MOTION to Continue bond hearing by Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez until July 26 at 2:00 pm.. (LV) Modified on 7/25/2024 (LV).
Related: [-]
8 8 ORAL ORDER granting 7 Motion to Continue bond hearing as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/25/2024. (LV)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez: Initial Appearance set for 7/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (LV)
Related: [-]
10 10 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli: INITIAL APPEARANCE in Rule 5(c)(3) proceedings held on 7/25/2024 as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez from the District of New Mexico. (digital) (Interpreter/Language: J. Plunkett, spanish) (LV)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Standing Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act,[LINK:3:20-mc-20-TJC, Doc 1] as to Wenry Gabriel Gomez-Lopez: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' disclosure obligation under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to comply with that obligation. Violating this order may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and other sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan. (LV)
Related: [-]