Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary Ann Whipple
Case #: 3:24-bk-31391
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Mar 25, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
LTC Transportation, LLC
120 Meadowbrook Ln
Saint Marys, OH 45885-9609
Represented By
Eric R. Neuman
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
147 147 claims Objection to Claim Wed 05/14 1:05 PM
Objection to Claim Number 6 by Claimant The First National Bank of Pandora. (Amended) Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
utility Notice Requiring Corrective Document Tue 05/13 4:04 PM
Notice Requiring Corrective Document: Paragraph three references Claim 5-1. Related [+] (dzeme)
Related: [-] 145 Objection to Claim
Monday, May 12, 2025
146 146 notice Notice of Objection Mon 05/12 3:03 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC Related [+]. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-] 145 Objection to Claim Number 6 by Claimant The First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
145 145 claims Objection to Claim Mon 05/12 3:01 PM
Objection to Claim Number 6 by Claimant The First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]
144 144 notice Notice of Objection Mon 05/12 2:58 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC Related [+]. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-] 143 Objection to Claim Number 4 by Claimant The First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
143 143 claims Objection to Claim Mon 05/12 2:52 PM
Objection to Claim Number 4 by Claimant The First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]
142 142 notice Notice of Objection Mon 05/12 2:50 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC Related [+]. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-] 141 Objection to Claim Number 3 by Claimant The First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
141 141 claims Objection to Claim Mon 05/12 2:46 PM
Objection to Claim Number 3 by Claimant The First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]
140 140 notice Notice of Objection Mon 05/12 2:35 PM
Notice of Objection Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC Related [+]. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-] 139 Objection to Claim Number 5 by Claimant First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
139 139 claims Objection to Claim Mon 05/12 2:35 PM
Objection to Claim Number 5 by Claimant First National Bank of Pandora. Filed by Debtor LTC Transportation, LLC. (Neuman, Eric aty)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
138 138 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Fri 05/09 12:12 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 137