Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Natalie Hirt Adams
Case #: 8:24-cv-01777
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Terminated:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 6:36 AM EST
Defendant
Manatee Memorial Hospital, L.P.
Represented By
Jonathan A. Beckerman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Alex Brandon Claude Ershock
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wellington Regional Medical Center
Represented By
Jonathan A. Beckerman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Alex Brandon Claude Ershock
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlene Wojcik
Represented By
Amanda E. Heystek
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info
Nikole Miller
Wenzel Fenton Cabassa, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
9 9 order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 09/04 1:33 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law" (Doc. 8 ) is hereby granted. Plaintiff and Defendants are directed to arbitrate this dispute. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. The parties are directed to notify the Court upon resolution of the arbitration proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/4/2024. (ANL)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Stay Wed 09/04 10:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Manatee Memorial Hospital, L.P., Wellington Regional Medical Center.(Beckerman, Jonathan) Modified text on 9/4/2024 (BD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
7 7 service Summons issued Wed 08/14 3:45 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Manatee Memorial Hospital, L.P., Wellington Regional Medical Center.(JTM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Main Document Summons
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/07 10:33 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Charlene Wojcik. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 08/07 10:32 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Charlene Wojcik. Related case(s): Yes (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program Mon 08/05 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/29 3:53 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-1777-TPB-NHA. (ARL)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 07/29 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Amanda E. Heystek on behalf of Charlene Wojcik. Lead Counsel: Amanda Heystek. (Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/29 2:45 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22346636) filed by Charlene Wojcik.(Heystek, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons