Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Jane M Beckering
Referred: Ray Kent
Case #: 1:24-cv-00775
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Terminated:Aug 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 4:18 AM EST
defendant
United States of America
plaintiff
Latonya Richardson-Brown #66557-509
Alderson (FPC) Federal Prison Camp Glen Ray Rd. Box A
Alderson, WV 24910


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 15, 2024
utility Copies Mailed Thu 08/15 9:05 AM
Copy of Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Michigan3 sent via U.S. Mail to Latonya Richardson-Brown #66557-509 (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Electronic Transfer of Civil Case to Other District Thu 08/15 9:06 AM
CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Eastern District of Michigan (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Acknowledgment from Other Court of Receipt of a WDMI Transferred-Out Case Fri 08/16 10:46 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Eastern District of Michigan, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 2:24-cv-12144-LJM (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order Transferring Case to Eastern District of Michigan Wed 08/14 2:14 PM
ORDER: the Clerk shall update the docket consistent with this Order; transferring case to the Eastern District of Michigan; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
2 2 misc Receipt of Case Notice Mon 07/29 3:05 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/29 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against USA filed by Latonya Richardson-Brown #66557-509 (mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1
utility Copies Mailed Mon 07/29 3:07 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice2 sent via U.S. Mail to Latonya Richardson-Brown #66557-509 (mg)
Related: [-]