California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:24-cv-06374
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Terminated:Oct 15, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 1:18 AM PST
Defendant
AK Auto Services
Defendant
Jerry Kohen
Represented By
Ori Samuel Blumenfeld
Levinson Arshonsky Kurtz And Komsky, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jeremy Holland
Represented By
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/15 11:38 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On October 11, 2024, Plaintiff Jeremy, dismissing the action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)20 . Having considered the Notice and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby ORDERS: 1. All dates and deadlines governing this action are VACATED. 2. The court DISMISSES the action with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 10/11 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
19 19 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 10/01 2:43 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Appearance Tue 10/01 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ori Samuel Blumenfeld on behalf of Defendant Jerry Kohen (Attorney Ori Samuel Blumenfeld added to party Jerry Kohen(pty:dft))(Blumenfeld, Ori)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 09/27 12:09 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to AK Auto Services (lc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 09/26 9:55 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant AK Auto Services filed by plaintiff Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 09/25 11:53 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeremy Holland, upon Defendant Jerry Kohen served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JERRY KOHEN, AS TRUSTEE OF THE JERRY AND ORIT KOHEN LIVING TRUST, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 09/13 10:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeremy Holland, upon Defendant AK Auto Services served on 9/4/2024, answer due 9/25/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Adolfo Flores, owner in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
13 13 misc Response Mon 08/12 2:39 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Hollandto Order to Show Cause11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
12 12 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Tue 07/30 5:48 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rolm)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 07/30 4:53 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/13/2024. (tf)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 07/30 4:52 PM
STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICAN WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 07/30 4:51 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 07/30 2:34 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants AK Auto Services, Jerry Kohen. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 07/30 1:02 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 07/30 1:01 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 07/30 1:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 07/29 1:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/29 1:57 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 07/29 1:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/29 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37918594 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Jeremy Holland(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]