California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 5:24-cv-01590
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Case in other court:Riverside Superior Court, CVPS2403707
Last checked: Saturday Jan 25, 2025 1:23 AM PST
Defendant
Aegis Defense Services LLC
Represented By
Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Veena Bhatia
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Aegis LLC
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Gardaworld Federal Services, LLC
Represented By
Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Veena Bhatia
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Valerie Marruquin
Represented By
Gary S Brotman
Marquee Law Group Apc
contact info
Diego Gallego Gomez
Marquee Law Group Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
23 23 notice Change of Lead Counsel Tue 03/18 12:39 PM
NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Shannon B. Nakabayashi to Andrew J. Mailhot. filed by Defendant Gardaworld Federal Services, LLC, (Mailhot, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
22 22 18 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 4:46 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (lom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/18 3:27 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Having considered the parties' proposed pre-trial and trial dates, the Court hereby sets the following schedule governing this case: Hearing on Motions In Limine 04/28/2026; Final Pretrial Conference set for 05/05/2026 10:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 05/19/2026 09:00 AM. For specific instructions on mandatory trial procedures, the Court refers counsel to the Court's Civil Trial Order. Please read that Order carefully as the procedures may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. See minute order for additional deadlines. (lom)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 16, 2025
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Sun 02/16 2:57 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: In light of the Court being in trial, the Scheduling Conference set for 02/18/25 is hereby vacated and taken under submission. The Court will issue a separate order relying on the 26(f) report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
19 19 misc Report Tue 02/04 7:30 PM
JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT REPORT of JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT filed by Plaintiff Valerie Marruquin.(Ghasri, Poya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PROPOSED SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
18 18 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 01/29 2:12 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Tue 01/28 6:10 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gary S Brotman counsel for Plaintiff Valerie Marruquin. Diego Gallego Gomez is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Valerie Marruquin. (Brotman, Gary)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Tue 01/28 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alexandra Ryann Purcell on behalf of Plaintiff Valerie Marruquin (Attorney Alexandra Ryann Purcell added to party Valerie Marruquin(pty:pla))(Purcell, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
15 15 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/25 2:42 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2025 at 10:00 AM. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 11/04 4:49 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), (Pursuant to Docket no. 13 - filed answer in Riverside Superior Court on August 30, 2024) filed by Defendants Gardaworld Federal Services, LLC, Aegis Defense Services LLC.(Nakabayashi, Shannon)
Related: [-]
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 11/04 3:47 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: The deadline set in the osc issued on 11/04/24 is discharged. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/04 6:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than November 12, 2024, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following on or before the above date as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Response to the amended complaint by the defendant or an application for entry of default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 08/02 9:31 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (smo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
10 10 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 07/31 10:26 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 07/31 10:26 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Wed 07/31 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for discovery. Pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Hernan D. Vera. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:24-cv-01590 HDV (ASx). (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
7 7 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 07/29 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANTS AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC, GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC, re Corporate Disclosure Statement5 , Miscellaneous Document,6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Declaration4 , Declaration,3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on JULY 29, 2024. (Bhatia, Veena)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 07/29 3:45 PM
DEFENDANTS' GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC AND AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 (Nakabayashi, Shannon)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/29 3:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC, GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC identifying GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Nakabayashi, Shannon)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Mon 07/29 3:39 PM
DECLARATION of Iliyana Whiteway re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Defendants AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC, GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC. (Nakabayashi, Shannon)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Mon 07/29 3:35 PM
DECLARATION of Veena Bhatia re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 filed by Defendants AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC, GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC.(Bhatia, Veena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to D
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 07/29 3:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC, GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC. (Nakabayashi, Shannon)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/29 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVPS2403707 Receipt No: ACACDC-37919622 - Fee: $405, filed by DEFENDANTS AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC, GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC. (Attorney Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi added to party AEGIS DEFENSE SERVICES LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Bettis Nakabayashi added to party GARDAWORLD FEDERAL SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft))(Nakabayashi, Shannon)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 07/31 10:32 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aegis Defense Services LLC, Aegis LLC, Does, Gardaworld Federal Services, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Valerie Marruquin. (FILED IN RIVERSIDE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/7/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]