California Northern District Court
Judge:Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Case #: 3:24-cv-04501
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2024
Case in other court:Santa Clara Superior Court, 24CV441982
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 21, 2025 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
Represented By
Lauren R. Goldman
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Katharine McCloskey
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Abigail Augus Barrera
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Michael G Rhodes
Cooley LLP
contact info
Darcy Caitlyn Harris
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Darrnell McCoy
Represented By
L Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Aurelio Medina
Represented By
L Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Oladeji Odumosu
Represented By
L Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alan Starzinski
Represented By
L Timothy Fisher
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info
Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
43 43 misc Transcript Mon 04/28 1:25 PM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/24/25, before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: 10:30 - 10:36. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Related [+] Redaction Request due 5/19/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/28/2025. (Jauregui, Tara)
Related: [-] 42 Transcript Order (s)42
Friday, April 25, 2025
42 42 misc Transcript Order Fri 04/25 1:55 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/24/2025 before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Recorded Proceeding - San Francisco. (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
41 41 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 04/24 11:36 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on April 24, 2025. (amolc2, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
40 40 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR Thu 04/24 11:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/24/2025. Case referred to private mediation. Written scheduling order to follow. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom. Plaintiff Attorney: Phillip Fraietta. Defendant Attorney: Darcy Harris. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2025)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/24 12:39 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 1/11/2026. Responses due by 3/13/2026. Replies due by 4/13/2026. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Thu 04/24 1:08 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
39 39 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Mon 04/21 4:29 PM
Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 10:30 AM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1603329440?pwd=OW1ZZWlZcklySHBMcStTVDZvZDJoUT09] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at amocrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than April 22, 2025 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 04/21 12:18 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 36 administrative motion to conduct case management conference by videoconference. (amolc2, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
37 37 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 04/17 10:58 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Alan Starzinski, Oladeji Odumosu, Aurelio Medina, Darrnell McCoy. (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
36 36 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 04/14 10:57 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Conduct Initial Case Management Conference By Videoconference filed by Alan Starzinski, Oladeji Odumosu, Aurelio Medina, Darrnell McCoy. Responses due by 4/18/2025.(Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Philip L. Fraietta,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
35 35 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 04/03 2:55 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
34 34 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 04/03 2:55 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
33 33 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 04/03 2:54 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
32 32 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 04/03 2:53 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Fisher, L.)
Related: [-]
31 31 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 04/03 1:21 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Harris, Darcy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
30 30 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 02/18 10:57 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. (Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-] 27 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
29 29 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Tue 01/21 5:06 PM
Request for Judicial Notice filed byAlan Starzinski, Oladeji Odumosu, Aurelio Medina, Darrnell McCoy. (Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 01/21 5:04 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byAlan Starzinski, Oladeji Odumosu, Aurelio Medina, Darrnell McCoy. (Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-] 27 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint
Thursday, December 19, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Thu 12/19 4:46 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/26/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 1/21/2025. Replies due by 2/18/2025.(Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 2 Declaration of Abigail A. Barrera,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14,
Att: 17 Exhibit 15,
Att: 18 Exhibit 16,
Att: 19 Exhibit 17,
Att: 20 Exhibit 18,
Att: 21 Exhibit 19,
Att: 22 Exhibit 20,
Att: 23 Exhibit 21,
Att: 24 Exhibit 22,
Att: 25 Exhibit 23,
Att: 26 Exhibit 24,
Att: 27 Exhibit 25,
Att: 28 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 11/12 12:21 PM
ORDER: In light of the amended complaint filed November 8, 2024 25 , the Court TERMINATES AS MOOT the Motion to Dismiss filed September 27, 2024 20 . Signed by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin on November 12, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
25 25 57 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/08 5:04 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against Meta Platforms, Inc.. Filed by Darrnell McCoy, Alan Starzinski, Aurelio Medina, Oladeji Odumosu.(Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redlined Version of First Amended Class Action Complaint
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/09 2:41 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting as modified 23 Stipulation to Continue Case Deadlines. Amended Complaint due by 11/11/2024. Answer or Other Response to the Amended Complaint due by 12/19/2024. Opposition due by 1/21/2025. Reply due by 2/18/2025. ADR Certifications due 21 days prior to the initial case management conference. Rule 26(f) Conference to be held 21 days prior to the initial case management conference. Initial Disclosures due within 14 days of the parties' rule 26(f) conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2025 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 10/08 7:58 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Deadlines filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 10/02 10:37 AM
Clerk's Notice Advancing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2024 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
21 21 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 09/27 8:09 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re20 MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed byMeta Platforms, Inc.. Related [+] (Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 09/27 8:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/27/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. Responses due by 10/28/2024. Replies due by 11/26/2024.(Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Abigail A. Barrera,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Terms of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Privacy Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Cookies Policy,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Business Tools Terms,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Terms of Service,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Data Policy,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Privacy Policy,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Privacy Policy,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Privacy Policy,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Privacy Policy,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Cookies Policy,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Cookies Policy,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Cookies Policy,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - Business Tools Terms,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - Introduction to the Advertising Standards,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - About Prohibited Information,
Att: 18 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 22, 2024
19 19 misc Transcript Order Thu 08/22 11:37 AM
*** DISREGARD per counsel; filed in the incorrect case *** TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on August 21, 2024 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Meta Platforms, Inc., for Recorded Proceeding - San Jose. (McCloskey, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/22/2024 (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/09 3:27 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren R. Goldman. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/09 3:22 PM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Darcy C. Harris. (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/09 9:45 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19709423.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(Goldman, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/09 9:42 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19709349.) filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(Harris, Darcy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail Augus Barrera (Barrera, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
13 13 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 07/31 9:35 AM
Order by Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin granting 12 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule for Contemplated Motion to Dismiss. Motion due by 9/27/2024. Response due by 10/28/2024. Reply due by 11/26/2024.(amolc1, COURTSTAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
12 12 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 07/29 5:04 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Briefing Schedule For Contemplated Motion to Dismiss filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 07/29 5:01 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Meta's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 07/29 3:23 PM
Clerk's Notice on Reassignment. You are noticed that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Martinez-Olguin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/martinez-olguin-araceli-amo/] . Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2024 no later than 12:00 PM PST. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 10, 19th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ads, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/29 1:26 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Araceli Martinez-Olguin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
8 8 utility ~Util - Notice Assigning/ Reassigning Case (CRJ) Mon 07/29 1:22 PM
This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Mon 07/29 12:41 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 07/29 11:06 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Darrnell McCoy, Aurelio Medina, Oladeji Odumosu, Alan Starzinski.. (Fraietta, Philip)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2024, 09:30 AM in San Jose - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meta Platforms, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,2 Certificate of Interested Entities (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
2 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meta Platforms, Inc. and Certificate of Interested Entities (McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV441982. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19660525). Filed by Meta Platforms, Inc..(McCloskey, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Elizabeth K. McCloskey,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Order Deeming Case Complex,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Register of Actions,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet