Original Case: 8:24-cv-00051

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02547
Typecivil / united states as a party
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 30, 2024 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. Railroad Retirement Board
Represented By
Danielle Rowley
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Lynnett Wagner
U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By
Daniel W. Wolff
CROWELL & MORING
contact info
Thomas P. Gies
CROWELL & MORING
contact info
Henry W. Leung
CROWELL & MORING
contact info
Scott P. Moore
BAIRD & HOLM
contact info
Spencer R. Murphy
BAIRD & HOLM
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/30/2024 3:15 AM CDT
Monday, July 29, 2024
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5418337] 24-2547 (RDB)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 7/12/2024 [5418344] 24-2547 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 09/09/2024. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Union Pacific Railroad Company due 09/09/2024.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5418347] 24-2547 (RDB)
Related: [-]