Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Joshua D Wolson
Case #: 2:24-cv-03467
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Case in other court:Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, 240100380
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 3:45 AM EST
Defendant
ALLIED MORTGAGE GROUP
Represented By
ANDREW M. CAROBUS
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
JENNY PERKINS
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
KATHY AMATO
Represented By
ANDREW M. CAROBUS
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
JENNY PERKINS
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC
Represented By
Kyra A. Josephson
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Chelsea Jasnoff
Zarwin, Baum, Devito, Kaplan, Schaer & Toddy, P.C.
contact info
LAUREN P. MCKENNA
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
CENLAR FSB
Represented By
MICHELLE H. BADOLATO
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young
contact info
JOE NGUYEN
Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP
contact info
Defendant
FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP.
Represented By
THOMAS CIALINO
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Kyra A. Josephson
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
LAUREN P. MCKENNA
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
MICHAEL P. TRAINOR
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PAUL BENSON
1233 Wharton Street
Philadelphia, PA 19147
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
MERSCORP
Terminated: 11/15/2024
Represented By
THOMAS CIALINO
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
MICHAEL P. TRAINOR
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Defendant
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Terminated: 11/15/2024
Plaintiff
KRISTY BENSON
Terminated: 12/10/2024
1388 Madison Avenue 18346
Pocono Summit, PA 18346

GPO Jan 10 2025
MEMORANDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/10/25. 1/10/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
GPO Jan 10 2025
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS ARE GRANTED AND MR. BENSON'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE IN PART AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART AS FOLLOWS: MR. BENSON'S CLAIMS FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY AND VIOLATION OF PENNSYLVANIA MORTGAGE LICENSING ACT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IF MR. BENSON SEEKS TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, HE MAY FILE A MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DO SO ON OR BEFORE 2/7/25; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 1/10/25. 1/10/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
90 90 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 5:54 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re79 MOTION for Leave to File filed by FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORP.. (CIALINO, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
89 89 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 3:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re79 MOTION for Leave to File filed by CENLAR FSB.(SMITH, SHERRI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 18, 2025
88 88 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/18 2:26 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re79 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by ALLIED MORTGAGE GROUP, KATHY AMATO.(CAROBUS, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
87 87 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/18 9:17 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re79 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A..(PAYNE HARMON, RHONDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
86 86 appeal USCA Order Thu 04/17 3:18 PM
ORDER of USCA as to65 Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment), filed by PAUL BENSON. THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED FOR LACK OF APPELLATE JURISDICTION. ETC. (dt)
Related: [-]