Utah Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joel T Marker
Case #: 2:24-bk-23750
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Recom LLC
1084 S 1680 W
Orem, UT 84059-2266
Represented By
George B. Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Washington Federal Bank Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111
Represented By
Matthew James Burne
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
80 80 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/14 11:01 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Recom LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 79 Notice
79 79 notice Notice Mon 04/14 10:59 AM
Notice Related [+] (Notice of Entry of Order Confirming Plan of Reorganization) Filed by Recom LLC. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-] 78 Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan
Friday, April 11, 2025
78 78 order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan (order) Fri 04/11 3:53 PM
Order Confirming Chapter 11 Plan. Related document(s)61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan filed by Debtor Recom LLC. (gci)
Related: [-]
77 77 11 pgs order Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order (order) Fri 04/11 3:50 PM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Regarding Confirmation of Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Dated February 21, 2025. (gci)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Fri 04/11 9:13 AM
Notice of Endorsemen Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection Filed by United States Trustee. (Burne, Matthew)
Related: [-] 75 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Re:61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan. (Hofmann, George) [Order# 462036] Modified on 4/10/2025 (jtt),76 Pending Order Re:61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan. (Hofmann, George) [Order# 462040]
trustee Trustee/USTR's Notice of Endorsement (NO IMAGE) Fri 04/11 3:19 PM
Trustee/USTR's Notice of Endorsement filed by Trustee/USTR. Related [+]. Endorsed with no objection. (Thomson, Michael)
Related: [-] 75 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Re:61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan. (Hofmann, George) [Order# 462036] Modified on 4/10/2025 (jtt),76 Pending Order Re:61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan. (Hofmann, George) [Order# 462040]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
76 76 misc Pending Order Thu 04/10 4:02 PM
Pending Order Re:61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan. (Hofmann, George)
Related: [-]
75 75 misc Pending Order Thu 04/10 3:33 PM
Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Re:61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan. (Hofmann, George) [Order# 462036] Modified on 4/10/2025 (jtt)
Related: [-]
74 74 audio Digital Audio Recording Thu 04/10 2:43 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/10/2025 2:00:14 PM ]. File Size [ 2800 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:05:50 ]. (Confirmation Hearing). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Thu 04/10 2:53 PM
Minute Entry Re:61 Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by Recom LLC. Appearances: George B. Hofmann(DB); Matthew Burne(USTR); Michael Thomson(TR). Confirmation is granted. Declaration of Danny Hales is received OTF-Hofmann (skr)
Related: [-]