Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:24-cv-00891
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Nokia of America Corporation
Represented By
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amazon Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Nokia Corporation
Terminated: 12/23/2024
Represented By
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy
Terminated: 12/23/2024
Represented By
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 04/15 4:57 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks.(lnb)
Related: [-]
20 20 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/15 4:53 PM
SO ORDERED, re19 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 4/15/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 04/08 12:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Amazon Technologies, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
18 18 respm Brief - Reply Tue 02/18 3:57 PM
REPLY BRIEF re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nokia of America Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
17 17 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Mon 02/10 4:37 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/18/2025.(Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A
Monday, January 06, 2025
16 16 misc Declaration Mon 01/06 4:48 PM
DECLARATION of Brian E. Farnan re15 Opening Brief in Support by Nokia of America Corporation.(Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13
15 15 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Mon 01/06 4:38 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Nokia of America Corporation.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/21/2025. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Mon 01/06 4:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Nokia of America Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
order SO ORDERED Mon 12/23 8:44 AM
SO ORDERED, re12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to January 6, 2025; (2) in the event that Defendants file an answer to the Complaint that includes counterclaims, or if Defendants file a mot filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/23/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Terminate Parties and their Attorneys Mon 12/23 11:03 AM
[SEALED] SO ORDERED, re13 Stipulation filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/23/2024.This will be emailed to local counsel. (lnb) (lnb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time) Fri 12/20 11:17 AM
[SEALED] Joint STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order of Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice by Amazon Technologies, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 12/20 11:03 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) for Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to January 6, 2025; (2) in the event that Defendants file an answer to the Complaint that includes counterclaims, or if Defendants file a motion to dismiss the Complaint (or any other pre-answer motion), the deadline for Plaintiff to respond to any such counterclaims or motion shall be February 10, 2025; and (3) the deadline for Defendants to file a reply in support of any pre-answer motion shall be February 24, 2025 - filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
order SO ORDERED Tue 12/17 8:06 AM
SO ORDERED, re11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to December 20, 2024 filed by Nokia of America Corporation. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/17/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
11 11 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 12/16 3:48 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to December 20, 2024 - filed by Nokia of America Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
order SO ORDERED Tue 12/10 8:00 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 12/16/2024 filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia of America Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/10/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
10 10 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 12/09 12:37 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 12/16/2024 - filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
order SO ORDERED Fri 12/06 10:13 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 12/9/2024 filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia of America Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/6/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
9 9 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 12/05 11:43 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 12/9/2024 - filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
order SO ORDERED Tue 11/26 8:08 AM
SO ORDERED, re8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 12/5/2024 filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia of America Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/26/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
8 8 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 11/25 1:56 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 12/5/2024 - filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation. (Farnan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
order SO ORDERED Tue 08/13 12:06 PM
SO ORDERED, re7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/25/2024 filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia of America Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 8/13/2024. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
7 7 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 08/12 3:41 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 11/25/2024 - filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation. (Farnan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/31 12:13 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/30 4:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amazon Technologies, Inc..Nokia of America Corporation served on 7/30/2024, answer due 8/20/2024. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 07/30 12:00 PM
Summonses Issued as to Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy and Nokia of America Corporation on 7/30/2024.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy,
Att: 2 Summons Issued Nokia of America Corporation
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 07/30 11:57 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon Technologies, Inc. filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc. (jfm)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 07/30 11:56 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) see attached. (jfm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 07/30 11:56 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 186 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/30 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Nokia Corporation, Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy, Nokia of America Corporation (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4463765.) - filed by Amazon Technologies, Inc.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-M,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet