New York Southern District Court
Judge:John P Cronan
Case #: 1:24-cv-05748
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
Hyperlite Mountain Gear Inc.
40 Main St. Suite 13-120
Biddeford, ME 04005
Plaintiff
Marcos Calcano
on behalf of himself and all other persons similarly situated, c/o Gottlieb & Associates PLLC 150 East 18 Street
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/13 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Hyperlite Mountain Gear Inc.. Document filed by Marcos Calcano. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/06 11:51 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A. LaBollita on behalf of Marcos Calcano..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 07/31 10:49 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hyperlite Mountain Gear Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 07/31 10:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marcos Calcano. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 07/31 10:39 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 07/31 10:44 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 07/31 10:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 07/31 10:45 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/30 11:18 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hyperlite Mountain Gear Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Marcos Calcano..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/30 11:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/30 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Hyperlite Mountain Gear Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29675384)Document filed by Marcos Calcano..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]