California Southern District Court
Judge:Jinsook Ohta
Referred: Michael S Berg
Case #: 3:24-cv-01333
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 12:40 AM PST
Defendant
LPL Financial, LLC
Represented By
Brittney M. Angelich
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Molly M. White
Mcguirewoods
contact info
Jessica B. King
Markun Zusman & Compton LLP
contact info
Jeffrey K Compton
Markun Zusman & Compton LLP
contact info
Alexander M. Madrid
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Cheryl L. Haas
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Alan Smith
Markun Zusman & Compton LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Represented By
Irean Zhang Swan
Rosing Pott & Strohbehn
contact info
Molly M. White
Mcguirewoods
contact info
Michael Stephen Taaffe
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Daniel S. Agle
Klinedinst PC
contact info
Justin Patrick Senior
Shumaker, Loop And Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Gregory A Garbacz
Klinedinst PC
contact info
James E. Fanto
Shumaker Loop & Kendrick LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 24 2025
Stipulated Modified Protective ORDER (Re ECF No. 58). Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 1/23/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rxc)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, January 24, 2025
59 59 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Fri 01/24 8:40 AM
Stipulated Modified Protective ORDER Related [+]. Signed by Judge Jinsook Ohta on 1/23/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rxc)
Related: [-] ECF No.58
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
58 58 motion Reopen Case Tue 01/21 1:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Reopen Case to Enter Modified Protective Order by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, LPL Financial, LLC. (White, Molly)Attorney Molly M. White added to party Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC(pty:pla) (rxc)
Related: [-]