Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00261
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Dec 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Concora Credit
14600 NW Greenbrier Parkway
Beaverton, OR 97006
Represented By
Concora Credit
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, December 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/27 12:49 AM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-261 Closed. (Tonya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
15 15 misc Proof of Service (BK) Tue 12/10 9:06 AM
Proof of Service of Agreed Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, December 09, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Mon 12/09 11:52 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary With Prejudice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, December 06, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation (AP) Fri 12/06 5:06 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings Fri 12/06 4:06 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration Filed by Richard Maselli on behalf of Defendant Concora Credit, Inc. a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Genesis FS Card Services, Inc., d/b/a Milestone Credit Card Related [+]. (Maselli, Richard)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, October 18, 2024
court Fri 10/18 8:59 PM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 12/16/2024 09:30 AM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and to Compel Arbitration Doc10 . This entry will serve as the official notification of hearing from the court. Related [+]. (Bill)
Related: [-] 10
court Hearing Set Fri 10/18 9:02 PM
Hearing Set 12/16/2024 at 09:30 AM in re: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and to Compel Arbitration. All parties may attend the hearing in person. Parties are directed to review Judge McEwens Procedures Governing Court Appearances (available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/judges/mcewen) for her policies and procedures for remote attendance at hearings by video or telephone via Zoom. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2024 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Pamella)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
11 11 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 10/15 4:28 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Richard Maselli on behalf of Defendant Concora Credit, Inc. a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Genesis FS Card Services, Inc., d/b/a Milestone Credit Card. (Maselli, Richard)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/15 4:26 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Richard Maselli on behalf of Defendant Concora Credit, Inc. a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Genesis FS Card Services, Inc., d/b/a Milestone Credit Card. (Maselli, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
9 9 misc Summons Service Executed Mon 09/16 12:03 PM
Service Executed on Concora Credit of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
8 8 court Alias or Pluries Summons Issued Tue 09/10 4:56 PM
Alias Summons Issued on Concora Credit, Inc. a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Genesis FS Card Services, Inc., d/b/a Milestone Credit Card. Answer Due 10/10/2024. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Request for Alias or Pluries Summons Tue 09/10 5:31 AM
Alias Summons Requested on Concora Credit, Inc. a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Genesis FS Card Services, Inc., d/b/a Milestone Credit Card. Answer Due 10/10/2024. (Alias or Pluries Summons Pending.) Filed by Thomas A Lash. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 misc Proof of Service (BK) Mon 09/09 10:49 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service on Defendant. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 order Extend Time Fri 09/06 12:04 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service (14 Days) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Fri 09/06 9:09 AM
Motion to Extend Time to Serve Complaint Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 11:56 AM
Amended Summons Issued on Concora Credit, Inc. a Delaware corporation, f/k/a Genesis FS Card Services, Inc., d/b/a Milestone Credit Card Date Issued 7/31/2024, Answer Due 8/30/2024 (To reflect plantiff's atorney) . (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 1:56 PM
Summons issued on Concora Credit along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 12:38 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Concora Credit. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet