Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00262
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
KikOff Lending
200 South Virginia Street, STE 460
Reno, NV 89501
Represented By
KikOff Lending
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/06 7:22 AM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-262 Closed. (Tonya)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
17 17 misc Proof of Service (BK) Mon 10/21 7:33 AM
Proof of Service of Agreed Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 16
Saturday, October 19, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Sat 10/19 10:59 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Final Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Anel)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation (AP) Wed 10/16 7:05 AM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
14 14 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Mon 10/07 7:33 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/3/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Anel)
Related: [-] 1 ,13
Monday, September 30, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/30 6:27 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Jenny N Perkins on behalf of Defendant Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
12 12 misc Proof of Service (AP) Wed 09/18 3:58 PM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a Second Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Filed by Jenny N Perkins on behalf of Defendant Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Related [+]. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 order Extend Time Wed 09/18 2:45 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Until September 30, 2024 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jenny Perkins is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Wed 09/18 10:29 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Jenny N Perkins on behalf of Defendant Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proof of Service (AP) Wed 09/18 10:24 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Filed by Jenny N Perkins on behalf of Defendant Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Related [+]. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 order Extend Time Fri 09/13 8:31 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Extended Until September 18, 2024) Related [+]. Service Instructions: Jenny Perkins is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, August 29, 2024
7 7 motion Motion to Extend Time (AP) Thu 08/29 4:18 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Filed by Jenny N Perkins on behalf of Defendant Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 08/29 4:15 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: Kikoff, Inc.. Filed by Jenny N Perkins on behalf of Defendant Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 08/29 4:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jenny N Perkins on behalf of Defendant Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company,. (Perkins, Jenny)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 03, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 08/04 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #3 )
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 12:02 PM
Amended Summons Issued on Kikoff Lending LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Date Issued 7/31/2024, Answer Due 8/30/2024 (To reflect plantiff's atorney) . (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 1:56 PM
Summons issued on KikOff Lending along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 12:42 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against KikOff Lending. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet