Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00263
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Southwest Acceptance Finance Co. Inc.
5340 N 40th St
Tampa, FL 33610
Represented By
Southwest Acceptance Finance Co. Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, February 28, 2025
13 13 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 02/28 11:15 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Amended Motion to Continue Status Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 order Reschedule Hearing Thu 02/27 12:41 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing - Status Conference Originally Scheduled on March 10, 2025 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Thu 02/27 11:02 AM
Amended Motion to Reschedule Hearing On March 10, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
court Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB) Thu 02/27 10:51 AM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Thomas Lash for filing in the wrong case. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, Related [+]. (Juan)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Wed 02/26 7:34 AM
Motion to Reschedule Hearing On March 10, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 11, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Sun 01/12 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 01/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Thursday, January 09, 2025
8 8 court Clerks Entry of Default Thu 01/09 3:20 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Southwest Acceptance Finance Corporation, A Florida Corporation Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Juan)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 motion Motion for Entry of Default (AP) Tue 01/07 5:33 AM
Motion for Entry of Default against Southwest Acceptance Finance Corporation Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sat 10/19 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 10/16 10:00 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Adrienne)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 2:19 PM
Service Executed on SouthWest Acceptance Corporation of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 12:34 PM
Amended Summons Issued on Southwest Acceptance Finance Corporation, a Florida corporation Date Issued 7/31/2024, Answer Due 8/30/2024 (To reflect plantiff's atorney) . (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 4:56 PM
Summons issued on Southwest Acceptance Finance Co. Inc. along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 12:44 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Southwest Acceptance Finance Co. Inc.. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet