Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00264
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Payvantage LLC
1200 Falls Street
Jonesboro, AR 72401
Represented By
Payvantage LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
12 12 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 05/02 7:48 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 11
Thursday, May 01, 2025
11 11 order Reschedule Hearing Thu 05/01 11:58 AM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing - Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, April 28, 2025
10 10 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Mon 04/28 12:12 PM
Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On May 5, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 misc Proof of Service (BK) Wed 01/08 8:44 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 order Reschedule Hearing Tue 01/07 2:30 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing on Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/5/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, January 03, 2025
7 7 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Fri 01/03 8:33 AM
Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On January 13, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
6 6 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Tue 09/03 11:51 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Penny)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Friday, August 30, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/30 5:08 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Related [+]. Filed by Matthew J Vaughn on behalf of Defendant Payvantage, LLC, an Arkansas limited liability company,. (Vaughn, Matthew)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 2:16 PM
Service Executed on Payvantage of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 12:45 PM
Amended Summons Issued on Payvantage, LLC, an Arkansas limited liability company, Date Issued 7/31/2024, Answer Due 8/30/2024 (to reflect plaintiff's attorney) . (Cathy P.) Modified on 8/1/2024 (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 4:56 PM
Summons issued on Payvantage LLC along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 12:47 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Payvantage LLC. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet