Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00266
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Midflorida Financing, LLC
2925 Mall Hill Dr.
Lakeland, FL 33810
Represented By
Midflorida Financing, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/09 1:18 PM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-266 Closed. (Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
14 14 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 02/07 8:36 AM
Proof of Service of Agreed Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Fri 02/07 8:18 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation (AP) Wed 02/05 7:37 AM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
11 11 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Thu 01/30 4:41 PM
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Michelle Buchanan Filed by Walter C Thomas Jr on behalf of Defendant MidFlorida Financing LLC, a Florida limited liability company,. (Thomas, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Michelle Buchanan
Friday, January 24, 2025
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Change of Attorney Address - (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Fri 01/24 1:29 PM
Change of Address submitted to the Court on January 21, 2025, by Attorney Walter C Thomas, Jr of Walter Thomas, P.A. - 2549 Ryland Falls Drive - Lakeland, FL 33811. (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
court Attorney Address Discrepancy General Item 1.1 - Address Tue 01/21 3:12 PM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Firm or Address for Attorney on PDF Image does not Match the Address in the CM/ECF System. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE A NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS IN ACCORDANCE WITH Local Rule 2091-2 and submit a request to update their address through PACER:[LINK:https://pacer.uscourts.gov/] Related [+] (Sara M.)
Related: [-] [10 ]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 01/16 10:34 PM
Initial Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Walter C Thomas Jr on behalf of Defendant MidFlorida Financing LLC, a Florida limited liability company,. (Thomas, Walter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Thu 01/16 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 01/15/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Monday, January 13, 2025
8 8 court Clerks Entry of Default Mon 01/13 12:37 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against MidFlorida Financing LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Juan)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 motion Motion for Entry of Default (AP) Tue 01/07 5:29 AM
Motion for Entry of Default against MidFlorida Financing LLC Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sat 10/19 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 10/16 10:08 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Adrienne)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 1:56 PM
Service Executed on MidFlorida Financing of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 12:53 PM
Summons Issued on MidFlorida Financing LLC, a Florida limited liability company, Date Issued 7/31/2024, Answer Due 8/30/2024 (To reflect plantiff's atorney) . (Cathy P.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 4:56 PM
Summons issued on Midflorida Financing, LLC along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 12:51 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Midflorida Financing, LLC. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet