Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00268
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aldous & Associates PLLC
4625 South 2300 East, STE 207
Holladay, UT 84117
Represented By
Aldous & Associates PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
court Compromise Cross-Reference Wed 05/07 2:52 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:24-bk-02266-CPM, Doc. No. 34 . (Lidia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
court Compromise Cross-Reference Fri 04/11 11:12 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:24-bk-02266-CPM, Doc. No. 30 . (Brenton)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 notice Notice (DO NOT USE for appearances or hearings) Mon 04/07 12:48 PM
Notice of Pending Resolution Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 misc Proof of Service (BK) Wed 02/26 9:37 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
10 10 order Reschedule Hearing Tue 02/25 2:57 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing on Pretrial Conference. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/16/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Brenton)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Fri 02/21 7:19 AM
Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On March 10, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure (AP) Mon 10/21 5:03 PM
Disclosure Corporate 7007.1 Filed by Jerry W Sullivan on behalf of Defendant Aldous & Associates, PLLC, a Florida professional limited liability company. (Sullivan, Jerry)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/21 4:51 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Jerry W Sullivan on behalf of Defendant Aldous & Associates, PLLC, a Florida professional limited liability company. (Sullivan, Jerry)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 18, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sat 10/19 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
5 5 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Wed 10/16 10:13 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Adrienne)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 1:58 PM
Service Executed on Aldous & Associates of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 12:52 PM
Amended Summons Issued on Aldous & Associates, PLLC, a Florida professional limited liability company Date Issued 8/1/2024, Answer Due 9/3/2024 (to reflect plaintiff's attorney) . (Tonya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 11:56 PM
Summons issued on Aldous and Associates PLLC along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 12:58 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Aldous & Associates PLLC. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet