Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00269
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
P.O. Box 31785
TAMPA, FL 33631
Represented By
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 misc Proof of Service (BK) Wed 04/30 8:18 AM
Proof of Service of Agreed Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Tue 04/29 2:40 PM
Final Order Dismissing Adversary with Prejudice Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, April 28, 2025
15 15 misc Stipulation (AP) Mon 04/28 7:11 AM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
14 14 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 02/24 9:14 AM
Amended Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Jason Bowyer on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Bowyer, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
13 13 misc Proof of Service (BK) Thu 01/02 9:20 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, December 26, 2024
12 12 order Reschedule Hearing Thu 12/26 8:37 AM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing - Pretrial Conference Originally Scheduled for January 13, 2025 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/5/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, December 23, 2024
11 11 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Mon 12/23 7:29 AM
Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Hearing On January 13, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Fri 09/06 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 09/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #9 )
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Tue 09/03 7:53 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Lisa P.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/29 10:19 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Filed by Jason Bowyer on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Bowyer, Jason)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, August 19, 2024
7 7 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 08/19 1:53 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Corporate parents added to case: BAC North America Holding Company, Bank of America Corporation, NB Holdings Corporation.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, Berkshire Hathaway Inc. Filed by Jason Bowyer on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Bowyer, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/19 1:50 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers Filed by Jason Bowyer on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Bowyer, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/19 1:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers Filed by Jackson McKnight Story on behalf of Defendant Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association. (Story, Jackson)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 1:55 PM
Service Executed on Bank Of America of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 12:53 PM
Amended Summons Issued on Bank of America, N.A., a national banking association Date Issued 8/1/2024, Answer Due 9/3/2024 (to reflect plaintiff's attorney) . (Tonya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 11:56 PM
Summons issued on BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 1:02 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet