Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Jodi W Dishman
Case #: 5:24-cv-00783
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 2:42 AM CST
Defendant
Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Eric K Bowers
Zelle Llp - Dallas
contact info
Sterling E Pratt
Fenton Fenton Smith Reneau & Moon
contact info
Plaintiff
First Baptist Church
Represented By
Benjamin D Doyle
Stockard Johnston Brown Netardus & Doyle
contact info
Geoffrey A Tabor
Glass & Tabor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
26 26 order Administrative Closing Order Wed 05/07 2:04 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER. It is ORDERED that the Clerk administratively terminate this action in her records. Unless a party moves to reopen or extend this proceeding within 45 days of the entry of this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice, and this Order shall become a final judgment that satisfies the separate-document requirement for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 05/07/2025. (cd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 05/05 12:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by First Baptist Church (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Address Change Sun 04/27 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric K Bowers (Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
23 23 trial Exhibit List / Witness List Mon 04/21 7:25 PM
Exhibit List / Witness List (Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibit List and Witness List) by Defendant Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
22 22 trial Witness List Mon 04/21 7:14 PM
Witness List by Defendant Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
21 21 trial Exhibit List Mon 04/21 7:12 PM
Exhibit List by Defendant Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
20 20 notice ~Notice (other) Mon 04/07 7:30 PM
NOTICE (other) by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company Designation of Experts (Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
19 19 trial Exhibit List Mon 04/07 12:20 PM
Exhibit List by Plaintiff First Baptist Church. (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
18 18 trial Witness List Mon 04/07 12:19 PM
Witness List by Plaintiff First Baptist Church. (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
17 17 trial Witness List - Expert Mon 03/24 3:15 PM
Expert Witness List Plaintiff's 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures by Plaintiff First Baptist Church. (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Thu 03/20 1:30 PM
ORDER denying15 Joint Motion for Continuance and Entry of Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 03/20/2025. (cd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 motion Continue Wed 03/19 6:17 PM
JOINT MOTION to Continue and Entry of Amended Scheduling Order by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Proposed) Order
Monday, February 03, 2025
14 14 misc Joint Status Report Mon 02/03 11:42 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff First Baptist Church. (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
13 13 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 10/07 4:37 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin D Doyle on behalf of First Baptist Church (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
12 12 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 10/04 4:25 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Eric K Bowers on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/04 1:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are ORDERED to file a motion for a status conference if needed in the future or to indicate a conference is needed in the midway discovery joint status report required in paragraph 21. The Court declines any request made in the Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan [Doc. No. 10 para. 8F] to bifurcate discovery on bad faith and breach of contract claims. Motions in limine due 9/4/2025; Jury instructions due 9/4/2025; Voir dire requests due 9/4/2025; Discovery due by 6/6/2025. Jury Trial set for 10/14/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 502 before Judge Jodi W. Dishman. Motions due by 6/6/2025. Pretrial Report due by 9/4/2025.. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 10/04/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 10/04 1:13 PM
Docket Annotation: Defendant's counsel Eric K. Bowers and Plaintiff's counsel Benjamin Doyle are directed to promptly file their entry of appearance, per this Court's LCvR83.4. Also see the Court's Order at Doc. No. 7. Failure to file an entry of appearance by October 18, 2024, will lead to the Court not accepting filings from them and they will not be able to participate in this action until they have entered an appearance. (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
10 10 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Mon 09/30 1:21 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff First Baptist Church. (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 08/30 11:17 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Sterling E Pratt on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Pratt, Sterling)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Tue 08/27 4:42 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by First Baptist Church . (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Docket Tue 08/27 3:21 PM
NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND COUNSEL . The Court ORDERS counsel to file the Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan (now a single document) by October 1, 2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/27 3:20 PM
ENTER ORDER . Counsel for Defendant is directed to comply with this rule or move the Court for relief under LCvR83.3(c) no later than September 3, 2024. Entered at the direction of Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 8/27/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Tue 08/27 12:42 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company . (Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Tue 08/27 9:03 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Bowers, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Thu 08/01 11:43 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Geoffrey A Tabor on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tabor, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/31 4:59 PM
ENTER ORDER . Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to comply with LCvR83.3(a) or move the Court for relief under LCvR83.3(c) no later than August 7, 2024. Entered at the direction of Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 7/31/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Wed 07/31 8:35 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4486644. (Doyle, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/30 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company filed by First Baptist Church.(ekw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet