Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:24-cv-03353
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jan 23, 2025 4:44 AM EST
Defendant
Georgia Lottery Corporation
Represented By
Valentin Henri Jacques Dubuis
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Amee's Quick Mart
Defendant
Amee's Quick Stop
Defendant
Georgia Lottery Company
Plaintiff
Eric Dudley
175 New Hanover Ave
Meriden, CT 06451
Plaintiff
Sam Dudley
175 New Hanover Ave
Meriden, CT 06451


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
32 32 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 05/12 2:27 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Amee's Quick Mart. (ajw)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Filing Mon 05/12 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Filing Letter by Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/12 2:28 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley re32 Electronic Summons Issued. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
30 30 service Proposed Summons Thu 05/01 9:15 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley. Summons not issued due plaintiffs listed as the defendants and defendants listed as the plaintiffs.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Monday, April 21, 2025
29 29 service Summons Issued Mon 04/21 1:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Amee's Quick Stop, Georgia Lottery Company, Georgia Lottery Corporation. (gww)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
28 28 service Proposed Summons Mon 04/21 1:10 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. Summonses not issued due to incorrect case caption. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
27 27 service Summons Issued Tue 04/08 12:56 PM
Summons Issued as to Amee's Quick Mart, Amee's Quick Stop, Georgia Lottery Company, Georgia Lottery Corporation. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/08 12:56 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley re27 Summons Issued. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 04/02 11:39 AM
Submission of22 MOTION for Order to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
26 26 service Summons Issued Mon 03/24 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to Amee's Quick Stop, Georgia Lottery Corporation.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/27 4:12 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley re26 Summons Issued. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
25 25 service Proposed Summons Mon 03/24 9:42 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, March 14, 2025
24 24 service Proposed Summons Mon 03/17 10:05 AM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley. Summons not issued due to multiple defendants listed on one summons. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Pro Se Address Fri 03/14 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Eric Dudley (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
22 22 motion For Order Tue 03/11 10:26 AM
MOTION for Order Expediting the Proceedingsby Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. (ajw)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Pro Se Address Tue 03/11 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 02/04 3:26 PM
Submission of18 MOTION for Default Judgment, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
20 20 motion Clerks Entry of Default Wed 02/05 11:08 AM
MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Amee's Quick Stop and Amee's Quick Martby Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 02/05 11:09 AM
Submission of20 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 01/29 10:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). As Plaintiffs have failed to first move for and obtain a Clerk's Default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a), which requires proof of actual service, Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b) [Doc. 19] is DENIED. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/29/25. (mlb) Modified on 1/29/2025 to edit text (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/29 10:12 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley as to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley re Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
19 19 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/28 3:46 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Amee's Quick Stop and Amee's Quick Mart by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
18 18 motion Default Judgment Tue 01/28 3:43 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default against Defendant's Georgia Lotter Corporation and Georgia Lottery Company by Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley. (ajw) Modified docket text on 1/28/2025 (ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Fri 12/27 9:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). As Plaintiffs have failed to first move for and obtain a Clerk's Default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a), which requires proof of actual service, Plaintiffs' Motions for Default Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b) [Doc. 16 and Doc. 17] are both DENIED. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/27/24. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 12/27 9:46 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley as to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley re Order on Motion for Default Judgment. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
17 17 motion Default Judgment Thu 12/26 11:18 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Amee's Quick Stop and Amee's Quick Mart by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 motion Default Judgment Fri 12/13 2:42 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Amee's Quick Stop by Eric Dudley. (bgt)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Wed 12/11 8:51 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaintby Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Plaintiff's Consolidated Amended Complaint
14 14 respm Response to Motion Wed 12/11 8:47 AM
Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 12/06 11:58 AM
Submission of13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
13 13 12 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/18 12:46 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Georgia Lottery Corporation. (Dubuis, Valentin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
12 12 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/13 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley (ajw)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/13 3:49 PM
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amee's Quick Stop, Amees Quick Mart, Georgia Lottery Company, Georgia Lottery Corporationwith Jury Demand filed by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley.(ajw)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs respoth Objection Wed 11/13 2:02 PM
OBJECTION to the assignment of a Magistrate Judge for pretrial matters. by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 11/04 3:53 PM
Submission of5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
9 9 misc Order from Other Court Tue 10/29 11:30 AM
---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- ORDER of USCA- 11th Circuit re: Application for Leave to File a Second or Successive Habeas Corpus Petition, 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b): Accordingly, because Ingram has failed to make a prima facie showing of the existence of either of the grounds set forth in § 2244(b)(2), his application for leave to file a second or successive petition is hereby DISMISSED as to grounds one and two and DENIED as to ground three.1 ELB, BL and ALB (See attached order for complete text) (rlh) Modified on 10/29/2024 (rlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice To Counsel & Parties
utility Docket Correction Tue 10/29 11:32 AM
Notification of Docket Correction re9 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/INCORRECT CASE--- ORDER of USCA- 11th Circuit re: Application for Leave to File a Second or Successive Habeas Corpus Petition, 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b). (rlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 5 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/29 11:21 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amee's Quick Stop, Georgia Lottery Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
order Order Fri 10/18 9:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). The Court acknowledges that Plaintiff's response [Doc. 6] to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 5] has now been added to the docket, which was done after the Court's 10/16/24 minute order. Accordingly, the Court will consider all pleadings, as well as their timeliness. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/18/24. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/18 9:45 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley as to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley re Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
7 7 4 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 10/21 8:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amee's Quick Stop, Georgia Lottery Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
order Order Wed 10/16 12:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only). As Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 5] has been submitted to the Court without any opposition by Plaintiff, the Court DIRECTS Defendant to submit a proposed order on its Motion to Dismiss within fourteen 14 days of this order. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/16/24. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/16 12:51 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley as to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley re Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 9 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 10/17 9:16 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMfiled by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 10/15 2:35 PM
Submission of5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 12 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 09/24 12:46 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Georgia Lottery Corporation. (Dubuis, Valentin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 09/06 2:01 PM
ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. Doc.3 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiffs at their address of record and to email a copy of this order to Plaintiffs at ericsam1948@gmail.com. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 09/06/2024. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/06 2:02 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley re4 Order. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 3 pgs motion Leave to File Document Wed 09/04 2:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Allow Electronic Filing by Eric Dudley, Sam Dudley. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
2 2 12 pgs order Order Tue 07/30 2:22 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 07/30 2:24 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley as to Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley re2 Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/30 11:04 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Eric Dudley and Sam Dudley. (Filing fee $405, receipt number 100013198)(tht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 receipt,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet