New York Southern District Court
Case #: 7:24-cr-00275
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 31, 2024 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Manuel Zumba Mejia (1)
Represented By
Benjamin David Gold
Federal Defenders Of New York Inc. (white Plains)
contact info
S. Isaac Wheeler
Federal Defenders Of New York Inc. (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jorja Nicole Knauer
Doj-Usao
contact info
Qais Ghafary
Doj-Usao
contact info
Margaret Vasu
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The Southern District Of New
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/31/2024 4:17 AM EDT
Thursday, December 15, 2022
1 1 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
Arrest of Manuel Zumba Mejia. (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Initial Appearance as to Manuel Zumba Mejia held on 1/5/2023. Bond Hearing as to Manuel Zumba Mejia held on 1/5/2023. AUSA Qais Ghafary for the Government. Ben Gold for Defendant. BAIL DISPOSITION: DEF. RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE; $50,000 PRB; 2 FRP; TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS (& NO NEW APPLICATIONS); PRETRIAL SUPERVISION: AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; DEF. TO SUBMIT TO URINALYSIS; IF POSITIVE, ADD CONDITION OF DRUG TESTING/TREATMENT; DEF. TO CONTINUE OR SEEK EMPLOYMENT; DEF. NOT TO POSSESS FIREARM/DESTRUCTIVE DEVICE/OTHER WEAPON; DEF. TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE, PLUS THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS: REMAINING CONDITIONS TO BE MET BY: 1/12/2023. Defendant present with his attorney Ben Gold and is advised of his rights and charges against him in the Complaint. AUSA:Qais Ghafary present. PTS:Andrew Abbott. Financial affidavit approved and Ben Gold is appointed to represent the defendant. Consular notification reviewed with defendant -- notification not requested at this time. Bail/detention arguments heard. Defendant released on own signature. See bond for additional conditions. PRELIMINARY HEARING DATE: 2/1/2023 ON DEFENDANT'S CONSENT. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
6 6 UNSECURED APPEARANCE BOND Entered as to Manuel Zumba Mejia in amount of $50,000.00, Cosigned by 2 FRP. The Defendant must: submit to supervision by and report for supervision to the PRETRIAL SERVICES As Directed; continue or actively seek employment; surrender any passport to: PRETRIAL SERVICES not obtain a passport or other international travel document; abide by the following restrictions on personal association, residence, or travel: SDNY/EDNY; not possess a firearm, destructive device, or other weapon; not use or unlawfully possess a narcotic drug or other controlled substances defined in 21 U.S.C. § 802, unless prescribed by a licensed medical practitioner.( 0) (n) submit to testing for a prohibited substance if required by the pretrial services office or supervising officer. Testing may be used with random frequency and may include urine testing, the wearing of a sweat patch, a remote alcohol testing system, and/or any form of prohibited substance screening or testing. The defendant must not obstruct, attempt to obstruct, or tamper with the efficiency and accuracy of prohibited substance screening or testing; report as soon as possible, to the pretrial services or supervising officer, every contact with law enforcement personnel, including arrests, questioning, or traffic stops; Abide by any active orders of protection. (ap) Modified on 1/9/2023 (ap). (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/3/2023) (jbo). [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Manuel Zumba Mejia. APPROVED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
COMPLAINT UNSEALED as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 Order to Unseal Case as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 1/6/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
8 8 ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 2/1/2023 until 3/1/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 2/1/2023)(jw) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIRMATION of Qais Ghafary by USA as to Manuel Zumba Mejia re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jw) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
10 10 2ND ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 3/1/2023 until 3/29/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 3/1/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
11 11 AFFIRMATION of Qais Ghafary in Support by USA as to Manuel Zumba Mejia re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
12 12 3RD ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 3/29/2023 until 4/26/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 3/29/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
13 13 AFFIRMATION of Qais Ghafary in Support by USA as to Manuel Zumba Mejia re:12 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
14 14 4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 4/26/2023 until 5/24/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 4/26/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
15 15 AFFIRMATION of Qais Ghafary in Support by USA as to Manuel Zumba Mejia re:14 4TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
16 16 5TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 5/24/2023 until 6/21/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 5/24/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
17 17 AFFIRMATION of Qais Ghafary in Support by USA as to Manuel Zumba Mejia re:16 5TH Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
18 18 6TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 6/21/23 until 7/19/23. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 6/21/2023)(jw) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
19 19 AFFIRMATION of Qais Ghafary by Manuel Zumba Mejia re:18 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jw) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
20 20 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 7TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 7/19/23 until 8/16/23. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 7/19/23)(jbo) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
21 21 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 8TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 8TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 8/16/2023 until 9/13/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 8/16/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
22 22 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 9TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 9TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 9/13/2023 until 10/11/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 9/13/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
23 23 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 10TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 10TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 10/11/2023 until 11/8/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 10/11/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
24 24 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 11TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 11 TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 11/8/2023 until 12/6/2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 11/8/2023) (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
25 25 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 12TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 12TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 2/6/2023 until 1/3/2024. Any further stipulation must include a significant and current update on the progress of this matter. The explanation here is identical to the recitation in September, October and November 2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 12/6/2023) (See ORDER set forth) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
26 26 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 13TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 13TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 1/3/2024 until 1/31/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/3/2023) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
27 27 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 14TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 14TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 1/31/2024 until 2/28/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 1/31/2024) (ap) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
28 28 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 15TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 15TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 2/28/2024 until 3/27/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 2/28/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
29 29 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 16TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE AND 16TH ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. Time excluded from 3/27/2024 until 4/24/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 3/27/2024) (lnl) [7:22-mj-10105-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
Case Designated ECF as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy: Arraignment as to Manuel Zumba Mejia (1) Count 1 held on 5/2/2024. Defendant present with attorney Ben Gold. AUSA: Meg Vasu. Spanish Interpreter: Juan Devila-Santiago. The defendant waived indictment, was arraigned on the Felony Information, waived public reading, and entered a not guilty plea. The case was wheeled out and assigned to Judge Briccetti. The speedy trial time has been excluded until the first pretrial conference before the district judge, not to exceed May 16, 2024. Any further exclusion of time must be made to the District Judge. Bail continued. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Plea entered by Manuel Zumba Mejia (1) Count 1 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
Case as to Manuel Zumba Mejia REASSIGNED to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (ap)
Related: [-]
30 30 INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Manuel Zumba Mejia (1) count(s) 1. (ap)
Related: [-]
31 31 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Manuel Zumba Mejia. (ap)
Related: [-]
32 32 RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Manuel Zumba Mejia. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 5/2/2024) (ap)
Related: [-]