Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Paul G Byron
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:24-cv-01406
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Terminated:Aug 27, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:23 AM EST
Defendant
Orange Cycle Works, Inc.
Plaintiff
Victor Ariza
Represented By
Pelayo M. Duran
Law Office Of Pelayo Duran, PA
contact info
Roderick Victor Hannah
Roderick V. Hannah, Esq., P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 08/28 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/27 4:50 PM
ORDER re 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Orange Cycle Works, Inc., are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/27/2024. (ABD)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Mon 08/26 4:59 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 08/14 11:05 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Victor Ariza. Related case(s): No (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/14 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re3 Interested Persons Order by Victor Ariza. (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
7 7 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Mon 08/12 12:43 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:4 Case Management Scheduling Order by Victor Ariza. (Hannah, Roderick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 service Summons returned executed Thu 08/08 4:13 PM
RETURN of service executed on 08/07/2024 by Victor Ariza as to Orange Cycle Works, Inc.. (Duran, Pelayo)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons issued Fri 08/02 3:12 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Orange Cycle Works, Inc. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
4 4 order Case Management Scheduling Order Wed 07/31 3:42 PM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/31/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Interested Persons Order Wed 07/31 3:42 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/31/2024. (KM)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/31 1:43 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-1406-PGB-LHP. (RLK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/31 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT against Orange Cycle Works, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22354235) filed by Victor Ariza.(Duran, Pelayo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons