Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael M Baylson
Case #: 2:24-cv-03553
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:30 AM EST
Defendant
VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD.
4400 EAST BROADWAY BOULEVARD SUITE 501
TUCSON, AZ 85711
Represented By
GERALD J. VALENTINI
Deasey Mahoney Valentini North Ltd
contact info
MARIA V. GO
Cohen Vaughan
contact info
MICHAEL P. RAUSCH
Cohen Vaughan
contact info
Plaintiff
JORDAN DERRY HAYES
4737 Frankford Avenue #B3
Philadelphia, PA 19124
Represented By
ANNA KULL
Levy Konigsberg, LLP
contact info
REBECCA KIMMEL
Levy Konigsberg LLP
contact info
JOHN GUINAN
Levy Konigsberg, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
17 17 minutes Status Conference Mon 03/31 10:35 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH. Status Conference via Chambers held on 3/20/2025.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/25 4:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by AARTHI MANOHAR on behalf of JORDAN DERRY HAYES (MANOHAR, AARTHI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/10 2:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD..(GO, MARIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 09/17 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by J.D. Feenane on behalf of VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD.(Feenane, J.D.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Mon 09/16 8:34 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TO THE EXTENT THAT THE FACTUAL ALLEGATIONS IN THE CONTROLLING COMPLAINT ASSERT A CLAIM FOR RECOVERY OF DAMAGES FOR PHYSICAL OR EMOTIONAL ABUSE THAT IS NOT SEXUAL IN NATURE, ALL SUCH CLAIMS ARE DISMISSED AS BARRED BY THE STATUE OF LIMITATIONS; AND TO THE EXTENT OF FACTUAL ALLEGATIONS IN THE CONTROLLING COMPLAINT ARE PLED TO SUPPORT CLAIMS THAT ARE NOT TIME-BARRED AT THE TIME OF TRIAL, A FINDING OF THEIR RELEVANCE AND ADMISSIBILITY ARE RESERVED FOR THE JUDGE PRESIDING AT TRIAL. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 9/16/2024. 9/16/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Fri 09/13 11:18 AM
STIPULATION by VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD.. (VALENTINI, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/27 3:36 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JORDAN DERRY HAYES. VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD. waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (GUINAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/23 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARIA V. GO on behalf of VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD. with Certificate of Service(GO, MARIA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/20 8:50 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANNA KULL, ESQ. IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/20/2024.8/20/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 08/20 8:48 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION BY REBECCA KIMMEL, ESQ., IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 8/20/2024.8/20/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 08/12 1:06 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Anna Kull ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17667303.) filed by JORDAN DERRY HAYES..(GUINAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 08/12 12:49 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca Kimmel ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17667254.) filed by JORDAN DERRY HAYES..(GUINAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/09 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL P. RAUSCH on behalf of VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD. with Certificate of Service(RAUSCH, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 08/09 9:19 AM
ORDERED THAT, PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 42(A), THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTIONS ARE CONSOLIDATED WITH THE ACTIONS PREVIOUSLY CONSOLIDATED BEFORE THE HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH UNDER BARRON V. VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD., CIVIL NO. 21-4801 FOR PURPOSES OF RESOLVING ALL MATTERS PRIOR TO TRIAL. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 8/8/24. 8/9/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/05 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD J. VALENTINI on behalf of VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(VALENTINI, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 07/31 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD.. Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/31/2024. (ahf)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 07/31 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against VISIONQUEST NATIONAL, LTD. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17638985.), filed by JORDAN DERRY HAYES.(GUINAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form