Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gail A Weilheimer
Case #: 2:24-cv-03561
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP.
Represented By
Kayla M. Panek
Fisher Phillips
contact info
MICHAEL R. GALEY
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
DONALD DOLENTI
Represented By
Sarah Martinez
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
CHRISTINE E. BURKE
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
27 27 minutes Settlement Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 02/19 11:22 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY Settlement Video Conference held on 2/14/25. (rf, )
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Wed 02/19 10:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 2/19/25. 2/19/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
25 25 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 02/18 4:47 PM
Letter dated February 18, 2025 requesting entry of of a 41.1(b) order by DONALD DOLENTI. (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Letter Tue 02/18 4:26 PM
Letter dated February 18, 2025 by DONALD DOLENTI.(BURKE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, February 06, 2025
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/06 9:37 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP., filed by DONALD DOLENTI.(BURKE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
22 22 9 pgs order Order Thu 02/06 8:48 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF MAY FILE HIS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ADDING CLAIMS UNDER THE PENNSYLVANIA HUMAN RELATIONS ACT, ETC. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 2/6/25. 2/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation Tue 02/04 5:03 PM
STIPULATION FOR AMENDMENT OF PLEADING by DONALD DOLENTI.(BURKE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Amended Civil Action Complaint
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/29 2:45 PM
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/14/2025 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH T. HEY ON 1/29/25. 1/29/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 01/23 2:13 PM
ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/28/2025., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/14/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 1/23/25. 1/23/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/23 11:22 AM
ORDER THAT MOTION TO EXTEND IS GRANTED. JUDGE PAPPERTS 10/24/24 SCHEDULING ORDER IS VACATED. DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/28/2025., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/14/2025. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 1/23/25. 1/23/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
17 17 1 pgs misc Letter Tue 01/21 12:31 PM
Letter dated January 21, 2025 by OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP..(GALEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, January 17, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Fri 01/17 3:29 PM
Letter dated January 17, 2025 by OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP..(GALEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Requests for Production
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 01/17 11:15 AM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT TO DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 1/17/25. 1/17/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Thu 01/16 1:32 PM
Letter dated January 16, 2025 re: Discovery Dispute by DONALD DOLENTI.(BURKE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/08 10:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Martinez on behalf of DONALD DOLENTI (Martinez, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/12 7:37 AM
NOTICE re: Settlement Proceedings (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/30 12:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla M. Panek on behalf of OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP. with Certificate of Service(Panek, Kayla)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
10 10 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 10/28 1:05 PM
ORDER THAT FACT DISCOVERY DUE BY 1/3/2025., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 3/21/2025., MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 2/7/2025., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/8/2025 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 11A; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/2/2025., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 4/2/2025., TRIAL DATE SET FOR 4/15/2025 09:30 AM IN Courtroom 11A. CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE HEY FOR SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/28/24. 10/28/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/28/2024) (rf, )
Related: [-]
9 9 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 10/28 1:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT Pretrial Conference held on 10/28/24. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
8 8 misc Report Of Thu 10/24 2:13 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by DONALD DOLENTI. (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/18 9:39 AM
ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/28/2024 12:00 PM IN Video Conference. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 10/17/24. 10/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/14 4:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP..(GALEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL R. GALEY on behalf of OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP. with Certificate of Service(GALEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 08/29 4:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DONALD DOLENTI. OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP. waiver sent on 8/16/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/02 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. BURKE on behalf of DONALD DOLENTI (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 08/01 7:57 AM
Summons Issued as to OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP.. (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 07/31 11:32 AM
COMPLAINT against OSL RETAIL SERVICES, CORP. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17639461.), filed by DONALD DOLENTI.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]