Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:24-bk-02266

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Catherine Peek Mcewen
Case #: 8:24-ap-00273
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
First Credit Corporation, a Colorado corporation
3825 Iris Ave Ste 200
Boulder, CO 80301
Represented By
First Credit Corporation, a Colorado corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr
12191 W. Linebaugh Avenue #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Wed 04/16 12:07 PM
Adversary Case 8:24-ap-273 Closed. (Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 30, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 03/31 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #16 )
Friday, March 28, 2025
16 16 order Judgment Fri 03/28 10:55 AM
Final Default Judgment in Favor of the Plaintiff, Angela Welch, the Chapter 7 Trustee of the bankruptcy estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr. and against Defendant, First Credit Corporation. Amount Awarded: $3,330.00 Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, March 27, 2025
15 15 misc Proof of Service (BK) Thu 03/27 8:55 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion for Judgment by Default against Defendant. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 order Default Judgment Thu 03/27 8:25 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant, First Credit Corporation Related [+]. Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, March 24, 2025
13 13 motion Motion for Default Judgment Mon 03/24 11:58 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, March 21, 2025
12 12 misc Proof of Service (BK) Fri 03/21 10:09 AM
Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Continue Status Conference. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch Related [+]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] 11
11 11 order Reschedule Hearing Fri 03/21 9:16 AM
Order Granting Motion To Reschedule Hearing - Pretrial Conference Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 6/23/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . Service Instructions: Thomas Lash is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Lidia)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 motion Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing (AP) Thu 03/20 7:39 AM
Motion to Reschedule Hearing On March 24, 2025 Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Fri 01/24 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest Related [+]. Notice Date 01/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
Monday, January 20, 2025
8 8 court Clerks Entry of Default Mon 01/20 10:43 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against First Credit Corporation, a Colorado corporation Service Instructions: Clerks Office to Serve Related [+]. (Juan)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
7 7 motion Motion for Entry of Default (AP) Tue 01/07 5:25 AM
Motion for Entry of Default against First Credit Corporation Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Saturday, October 19, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (AP) Sun 10/20 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
Thursday, October 17, 2024
5 5 court Notice Of Pretrial / Status Conference Thu 10/17 7:48 AM
Notice of Pretrial/ Status Conference. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/24/2025 at 09:30 AM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. (Adrienne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 1:32 PM
Service Executed on First Credit Corporation of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Thomas A Lash on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Clifford Eugene Wilson Sr. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 08/01 1:12 PM
Amended Summons Issued on First Credit Corporation, a Colorado corporation Date Issued 7/31/2024, Answer Due 8/30/2024 (to reflect plaintiff's attorney) . (Tonya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/31 11:56 PM
Summons issued on First Credit Corporation along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 08/30/2024. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Tue 07/30 1:19 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against First Credit Corporation. Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet