Kahalewai v. City and County of Honolulu
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Jill A Otake |
Referred: | Rom Trader |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00323 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 26, 2025 10:24 PM HST |
Defendant
City and County of Honolulu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Corey Kahalewai
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 9/17/2024 pursuant to ECF29 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 16) AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF NO. 2). (jni) |
|
29 | 29
![]() ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (ECF NO. 16) AND DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (ECF NO. 2) re16 ,2 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/17/2024. (jni) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() EP: Hearing on a2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and16 Defendant City and County of Honolulus Motion for Summary Judgment was held. Oral arguments heard. 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. 16 Defendant City and County of Honolulu's Motion for Summary Judgment - TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Court to issue a written order. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
minutes
Link
Wed 09/11 11:37 AM
EO: The Court SETS the following procedure and time limits at the 9/12/24 hearing on Plaintiff Corey Kahalewai's2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant City and County of Honolulu's16 Motion for Summary Judgment: (1) Defendant will proceed on both motions for no longer than 15 minutes; (2) Plaintiff will proceed on both motions for no longer than 15 minutes; (3) Defendant will proceed with a 5 minute rebuttal on either motion (if counsel considers it necessary); (4) Plaintiff will proceed with a 5 minute rebuttal on either motion (if counsel considers it necessary). (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re21 Concise Statement in Opposition to Motion filed by City and County of Honolulu. (Gluck, Daniel) |
|
25 | 25
![]() REPLY re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City and County of Honolulu. (Gluck, Daniel) |
|
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE by Corey Kahalewai re19 Reply to Response to Motion supplemental authority Corey Kahalewai.(Beck, Alan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
minutes
Link
Fri 08/30 10:53 AM
EO: The Court construes Plaintiff's letter regarding its late-filed opposition to16 Defendant City and County of Honolulu's Motion for Summary Judgment as a request to extend the deadline under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b)(1)(B) and GRANTS it. See ECF No. 22. The Court therefore EXTENDS the deadline for Defendant to file its reply in support of its16 Motion for Summary Judgment from 9/3/2024 to 9/5/2024. The hearing on that motion and Plaintiff's2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction remains set for 9/12/2024. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Letter addressed to Judge Otake from Alan A. Beck, Esq., dated August 29, 2024, re: response to motion for summary judgment. (jni) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() CONCISE STATEMENT in Opposition re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corey Kahalewai.(Beck, Alan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Corey Kahalewai.(Beck, Alan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() REPLY to Response to Motion re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corey Kahalewai.(Beck, Alan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Wed 08/21 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:16 Defendant City and County of Honolulu's Motion for Summary Judgment is SET for 9/12/2024 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition is due 8/27/2024, Reply is due 9/3/2024. The parties are reminded to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake, which set forth certain requirements in addition to those stated in Local Rule 56.1(e) and provide examples of how to comply with those additional requirements. In addition, the Court CONTINUES the hearing on Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction from 9/5/2024 to 9/12/2024 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. The briefing deadlines regarding that motion remain as previously set. See ECF No. 13. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(tl) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City and County of Honolulu.(Gluck, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment Daniel M. Gluck appearing for Defendant City and County of Honolulu(Gluck, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by City and County of Honolulu.(Gluck, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() MEMORANDUM in Opposition re2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by City and County of Honolulu.(Gluck, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 08/08 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is SET for 9/5/2024 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition is due 8/19/2024. Reply is due 8/26/2024. (shm) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STATUS REPORT per Docket 7 by Corey Kahalewai. (O'Grady, Kevin) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Kahalewai. City and County of Honolulu served on 8/2/2024. (Beck, Alan) |
|
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Gluck on behalf of City and County of Honolulu on behalf of City and County of Honolulu. (Gluck, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu. (jni) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Summons (Proposed) (Beck, Alan) |
|
7 | 7
minutes
3 - Set Ripe Deadline
Thu 08/01 8:20 AM
EO: For purposes of determining when to set briefing and a hearing on Plaintiff's2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file a status report by 8/8/2024 addressing the status of service of the summons and1 Verified Complaint on Defendant. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) |
|
6 | 6
minutes
Link
Thu 08/01 8:04 AM
EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/30/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/31/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 07/31 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00323 JAO-RT on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Alan A. Beck appearing for Plaintiff Corey Kahalewai(Beck, Alan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Verified COMPLAINT against City and County of Honolulu ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3035226.), filed by Corey Kahalewai.(Beck, Alan) Modified on 7/31/2024 (eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |