Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-70531

Arkansas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Bianca M Rucker
Case #: 2:24-ap-07042
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jul 30, 2024
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Logan County Bank
P.O. Box 85
Scranton, AR 72863
Represented By
Logan County Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Joyce Bradley Babin
Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P.O. Box 8064
Little Rock, AR 72203
Represented By
Joyce Bradley Babin
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office of U.S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Friday, October 11, 2024
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/11 12:56 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-7042 Closed. (McDaniel, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/12 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment (Related Doc 8). Judgment Against Defendant In Favor of Plaintiff. Date of Judgment 9/10/2024 Entered on Docket 9/10/2024 (McDaniel, Lisa)
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 order Default Judgment Tue 09/10 4:18 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Judgment Against Defendant In Favor of Plaintiff. Date of Judgment 9/10/2024 Entered on Docket 9/10/2024 (McDaniel, Lisa)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Default Judgment (AP Motion) Tue 09/10 2:49 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant, Logan County Bank Filed by Joyce Bradley Babin on behalf of Plaintiff Joyce Bradley Babin Related [+] (Babin, Joyce)
Related: [-] 6 Entry of Default
Sunday, September 08, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/08 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailin Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Entry of Default(RE: related document(s)5 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Joyce Bradley Babin).
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 court Entry of Default (Court) Fri 09/06 10:57 AM
Entry of Defaul Related [+]. (McDaniel, Lisa)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Joyce Bradley Babin
Thursday, September 05, 2024
5 5 motion Entry of Default (AP Motion) Thu 09/05 4:29 PM
Motion for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Logan County Bank Filed by Joyce Bradley Babin on behalf of Plaintiff Joyce Bradley Babin (Babin, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 07/30 2:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Logan County Bank (Babin, Joyce)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Receipt (Auto) Tue 07/30 2:44 PM
RECEIPT of Complaint([LINK:2:24-ap-07042] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. receipt number A8597246, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 07/30 2:42 PM
Summons Issued on Logan County Bank Answer Due 08/29/2024 (Babin, Joyce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - COURT USE ONLY Tue 07/30 2:42 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-07042. Complaint to Determine the Extent and Validity of Lien, to Avoid Lien and Objection to Claim of Logan County Bank by Joyce Bradley Babin against Logan County Bank. Fee Amount Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (Babin, Joyce)
Related: [-]