Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew F Leitman
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-11990
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
Holzman Law, PLLC
Represented By
Michael V. Krempa
Holzman Law, PLLC
contact info
Charles Holzman
Holzman Law, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Security Credit Union
Represented By
Marc T. Bowen
Bowen, Radabaugh & Milton, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Imani Carter
2650 Macomb St.
Detroit, MI 48207
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Security Credit Union Foundation
Terminated: 08/09/2024

GPO Feb 13 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holzman Law, PLLC Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
GPO Mar 20 2025
Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)ORDER (1) Overruling Defendant's 33 Objection to 32 Report and Recommendation; (2) Adopting Recommended Disposition of 32 Report and Recommendation; and (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 19 Motion to Dismiss.

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
service Certificate of Service Mon 03/31 8:22 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re36 Stipulated Order Dismissing Case on Imani Carter at 2650 Macomb St., Detroit, MI 48207. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
36 36 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Fri 03/28 3:00 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Dismissing Claims Against Defendants With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/28 1:34 PM
[STRICKEN] STIPULATION of Dismissal of all Defendants by Holzman Law, PLLC (Krempa, Michael) Modified on 3/28/2025 (HRya)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Fri 03/28 2:17 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking35 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Holzman Law, PLLC. **DOCUMENT SHOULD BE EMAILED TO THE CASE MANAGER FOR ENTRY BY THE COURT** Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
34 34 order Adopting Report and Recommendation Thu 03/20 9:03 AM
ORDER (1) Overruling Defendant's33 Objection to32 Report and Recommendation; (2) Adopting Recommended Disposition of32 Report and Recommendation; and (3) Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 03/20 9:04 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re34 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, on Imani Carter at 2650 Macomb St., Detroit, MI 48207. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
33 33 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendation Wed 02/26 8:46 AM
OBJECTION to32 Report and Recommendation by Holzman Law, PLLC. (Krempa, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
32 32 motion Report and Recommendation Thu 02/13 11:39 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holzman Law, PLLC Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 02/13 11:43 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holzman Law, PLLC on Imani Carter at 2650 MACOMB ST., DETROIT, MI 48207. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
31 31 respoth Objection - Free Fri 01/17 9:58 AM
OBJECTION to19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Imani Carter. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
30 30 respm Supplemental Brief Fri 12/27 11:45 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holzman Law, PLLC. (Krempa, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 12/17 12:43 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2024 re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holzman Law, PLLC (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
29 29 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 11/06 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2024 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 11/06 2:31 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re29 Notice of Hearing on Motion on Imani Carter at 2650 MACOMB ST., DETROIT, MI 48207. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/09 9:39 AM
REPLY to Response re19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holzman Law, PLLC. (Krempa, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
27 27 respm Response to Motion Mon 09/23 3:18 PM
RESPONSE to19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Imani Carter. [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Certificate of Service Mon 09/23 10:45 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Imani Carter [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
25 25 respoth Response - Free Mon 09/23 10:11 AM
RESPONSE to24 Affirmative Defenses by Imani Carter. [Submitted Through Pro Se Portal] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
24 24 misc Affirmative Defenses Wed 08/28 10:05 PM
AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Security Credit Union (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/28 10:03 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Reliance on Jury Demand by Security Credit Union. (Bowen, Marc)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Requiring Responsive Pleading* Wed 08/28 10:44 AM
ORDER Requiring Response to19 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 9/23/2024 Reply due by 10/10/2024 Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 08/28 10:48 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re22 Order Requiring Responsive Pleading on Imani Carter at 2650 MACOMB ST., DETROIT, MI 48207. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
21 21 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Tue 08/27 10:36 AM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand and19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 08/27 10:37 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re21 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge on Imani Carter at 2650 Macomb St., Detroit, MI 48207. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
20 20 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 08/23 4:07 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles Holzman appearing on behalf of Holzman Law, PLLC Appearance of Chuck Holzman (Holzman, Charles)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Fri 08/23 12:42 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Holzman Law, PLLC. (Krempa, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 08/23 12:40 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael V. Krempa appearing on behalf of Holzman Law, PLLC Appearance of Michael Krempa (Krempa, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 08/23 12:39 PM
[STRICKEN] ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael V. Krempa appearing on behalf of Holzman Law, PLLC Appearance of Chuck Holzman (Krempa, Michael)
Related: [-]
notice Error Fri 08/23 2:19 PM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Michael V. Krempa re17 Attorney Appearance. Other ATTORNEY(S) MUST FILE APPEARANCE ON THEIR OWN BEHALF.. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (ABun)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
16 16 service Summonses Provided to Plaintiff for Service* Mon 08/12 10:18 AM
Summonses Provided to Plaintiff(s) for Service (TTho)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued* Mon 08/12 10:16 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Holzman Law, PLLC* (TTho)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued* Mon 08/12 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Security Credit Union* (TTho)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Correction Mon 08/12 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Correction re12 Summons Issued. (TTho)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued* Mon 08/12 9:53 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Security Credit Union* (TTho)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued* Mon 08/12 9:50 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Holzman Law, PLLC* (TTho) Modified on 8/12/2024 (TTho)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
10 10 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Mon 08/12 9:48 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Imani Carter against Holzman Law, PLLC, Security Credit Union. [PRO SE UPLOAD-INCORRECT CASE NUMBER ON UPLOADED DOCUMENT] (TTho)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation civil cover sheet
Friday, August 02, 2024
9 9 service Summonses Provided to Plaintiff for Service* Fri 08/02 8:21 AM
Summonses Provided to Plaintiff(s) for Service (SSch)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued* Fri 08/02 8:20 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Holzman Law, PLLC, Security Credit Union Foundation* (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
7 7 notice Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process Thu 08/01 2:49 PM
Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process. (HRya)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Thu 08/01 2:48 PM
ORDER Granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HRya)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Thu 08/01 9:36 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (DJen)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Thu 08/01 2:50 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs,7 Notice to Plaintiff Regarding Service of Process on Imani Carter at 2650 Macomb St., Detroit, MI 48207. (HRya)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
3 3 notice Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal Wed 07/31 3:49 PM
Plaintiff's Notice Waiving Service by U.S. Marshal by Imani Carter [Pro Se Upload] (TTho)
Related: [-]
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Wed 07/31 3:48 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Imani Carter. [Pro Se Upload] (TTho)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 07/31 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Imani Carter against All Defendants (TTho) (TTho)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/31/2024) Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet