California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 4:24-cv-04636
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 12:18 AM PST
Defendant
Abraham Shafi
Represented By
Britt H. Evangelist
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Jaimie L. Nawaday
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Mary McNamara
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Philip Moustakis
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Woortmann
Represented By
Britt H. Evangelist
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Jaimie L. Nawaday
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Mary McNamara
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Philip Moustakis
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities And Exchange Commission
44 Montgomery Street Suite 2800
San Francisco, CA 94104
Represented By
Marc David Katz
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Jason H. Lee
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Monique C. Winkler
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Matthew Gary Meyerhofer
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Sheila Ellen O'Callaghan
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Christopher Baldwin Marshall
contact info


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
58 58 order Case Management Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/29 11:42 AM
SCHEDULING AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery due by 1/30/2026. Opening Reports due by 3/16/2026. Rebuttal Reports due by 4/13/2026. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/4/2026. Dispositive/Daubert Motion filing due by 6/15/2026. Opposition due by 7/27/2026. Reply due by 8/31/2026. Compliance Deadline due by 1/15/2027, at 09:01 AM in Oakland, Chambers. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 1/22/2027. Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2027, at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2027, at 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. All compliance deadlines are decided on the papers and personal appearances are not necessary. If compliance is complete, the compliance deadline will be vacated. Failure to timely comply with the compliance deadline may result in sanctions or an additional conference being set. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/29/2025. (eac, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Tue 04/29 11:11 AM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
57 57 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Case Referred to Private ADR ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 04/29 11:08 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/28/2025. Case is referred to Private ADR due by 12/19/2025. Further Case Management Conference will be held via Zoom Webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2026. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2026, at 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at YGRCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 1, 2026, at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Stephen Franklin; via Zoom. (eac, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2025)
Related: [-]