Fernandez v. Konscious, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Dale E Ho |
Referred: | Gary Stein |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-05826 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:39 AM EST |
Defendant
Konscious, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jacqueline Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL IT IS HEREBY AGREED TO by the Plaintiff and Plaintiff's attorney that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that the above entitled action specifically with regard to Defendant shall be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice and on the merits, without costs, or disbursements, or attorney's fees to any party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and that a dismissal without prejudice may be entered in the above entitled action pursuant hereto. SO ORDERED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 11/21/2024) (ks) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Konscious, LLC. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause, by submitting a letter to the Court by no later than November 21, 2024, as to why Plaintiff has failed to serve the summons and Complaint within the 90 days prescribed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), or, if Plaintiff believes that Defendant has been served, provide proof of such service and explain when and in what manner service was made. If Plaintiff fails to timely show good cause for why this action should not be dismissed, the undersigned will recommend to Judge Ho that the action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 11/4/2024) (mml) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) to conduct all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, by August 16, 2024, file on ECF a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before the undersigned. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and soordered.If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter by August 16, 2024, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do notconsent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 8/2/2024) (tro) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein. (Signed by Judge Dale E. Ho on 8/2/2024) (laq) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Konscious, LLC..(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 08/01 12:24 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mark Rozenberg to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not signed by an attorney of record;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated May 28, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated May 28, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 08/01 12:25 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Dale E. Ho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 08/01 12:26 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 08/01 12:26 PM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to KONSCIOUS, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
![]() FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rozenberg, Mark) Modified on 8/1/2024 (jgo) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Konscious, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29685267)Document filed by Jacqueline Fernandez..(Rozenberg, Mark) |