South Dakota District Court
Judge:Camela C Theeler
Case #: 5:24-cv-05059
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 2:42 AM CST
Defendant
The United States of America
Represented By
Michaele Sanders Hofmann
U.S. Attorney'S Office (rapid City, Sd)
contact info
Defendant
Top Docs, Inc
Represented By
Roger A. Sudbeck
Boyce Law Firm LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dr. Denise Viola
Represented By
Gregory J. Bernard
Thomas Braun Bernard & Burke, LLP
contact info
Roger A. Sudbeck
Boyce Law Firm LLP
contact info
Kimberly S. Pehrson
Thomas Braun Bernard & Burke, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Thea J McCauley
Represented By
Robin L. Zephier
Zephier & Lafleur, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
David J Pourier
Represented By
Robin L. Zephier
Zephier & Lafleur, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Monday, April 07, 2025
45 45 misc Stipulation Mon 04/07 1:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counts 2 through 5 and count 7, as Alleged Against the US by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
notice Notice of Filing Error Fri 04/04 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Filing Error:44 Stipulation was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
44 44 misc Stipulation Thu 04/03 2:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counts 2 through 5 and 7 by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin) Modified text on 4/3/2025 (DJP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
43 43 order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 03/28 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting42 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 3/28/2025. (CR)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Extend Fri 03/28 4:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend time to respond to Motion to Dismiss by Thea J McCauley. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
41 41 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/26 5:44 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion for Sanctions, Attorney Fees, and Costs Against Defendant Viola. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 3/26/2025. (CR)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
40 40 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 03/14 11:12 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re39 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by The United States of America. (Hofmann, Michaele)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 03/14 11:10 AM
MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by The United States of America. (Hofmann, Michaele)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 02/13 4:22 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney by Dr. Denise Viola. Attorney Gregory J. Bernard terminated. (Bernard, Gregory)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 02/13 4:19 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney by Dr. Denise Viola. Attorney Kimberly S. Pehrson terminated. (Pehrson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Produce Wed 02/12 4:17 PM
ORDER granting35 Motion to Produce Records. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 2/12/2025. (CR)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Produce Wed 02/12 9:28 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Produce Records by The United States of America. (Hofmann, Michaele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order to Produce Documents
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
34 34 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/21 5:34 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/23/2026. Motions due by 5/18/2026. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 1/21/2025. (CR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
33 33 respm Reply to Motion Response Thu 01/02 5:23 PM
REPLY to Motion Response re26 MOTION for Sanctions and Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
32 32 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 3:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Gregory J. Bernard re26 MOTION for Sanctions and Attorneys Fees and Costs . (Pehrson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
notice Notice of Filing Error Fri 12/20 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Filing Error:30 Affidavit was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Pehrson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
31 31 misc Discovery Report Thu 12/19 1:06 PM
Discovery Report by The United States of America.(Hofmann, Michaele)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Affidavit Thu 12/19 11:04 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Gregory J. Bernard re29 Response to Motion, . (Pehrson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response to Motion Thu 12/19 11:01 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION for Sanctions and Attorneys Fees and Costs and Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Attorneys Fees and Costs Against Dr. Denise Viola filed by Dr. Denise Viola. (Pehrson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/09 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Sudbeck on behalf of Dr. Denise Viola. (Sudbeck, Roger)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
27 27 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Tue 12/03 10:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re26 MOTION for Sanctions and Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit April 25, 2023 letter from Attorney Greg Bernard,
Att: 2 Exhibit July 20, 2023 Email to Greg Bernard and Roger Sudbeck from Attorney Zephier,
Att: 3 Exhibit June 4,2024 Email to Greg Bernard,
Att: 4 Exhibit July 11, 2024 Letter to Greg Bernard,
Att: 5 Exhibit August 2, 2024 Letter to Greg Bernard,
Att: 6 Exhibit August 12, 2024 Email to Greg Bernard,
Att: 7 Exhibit Proof of Service from One Source Process and Proof of Non-service and Receipt from Hillsborough Sheriff,
Att: 8 Exhibit Admission/Waiver of Service,
Att: 9 Exhibit Receipt from One Source Process,
Att: 10 Exhibit Receipt from Consulting Service,
Att: 11 Exhibit Costs and Fees Summary
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/03 10:01 AM
MOTION for Sanctions and Attorneys Fees and Costs by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
25 25 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Tue 11/19 11:06 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Dr. Denise Viola. (Bernard, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
24 24 4 pgs order Order for Discovery Report Fri 11/15 1:47 PM
ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 11/15/2024. (CR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 11/14 2:25 PM
ANSWER to 1 with Jury Demand by Dr. Denise Viola. (Bernard, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly S. Pehrson on behalf of Dr. Denise Viola. (Pehrson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/12 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Bernard on behalf of Dr. Denise Viola. (Bernard, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/31 4:38 PM
Separate ANSWER to 1 by The United States of America. (Hofmann, Michaele)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 10/28 10:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thea J McCauley. Thea J McCauley served on 10/22/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use) Tue 10/01 9:20 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Top Docs, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Apprio Healthcare Systems and Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Apprio Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate HCAP Partners V, L.P. for Top Docs, Inc. (Sudbeck, Roger)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 29, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Noncompliance (Corporate Disclosure Statement) Sun 09/29 6:46 PM
NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable within 14 days of the party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. The deadline has passed and Top Docs, Inc has not complied. Said party has three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
16 16 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 09/25 2:34 PM
ORDER denying8 Motion to Extend Time and to Serve by Publication. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 9/25/2024. (CR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 9:53 AM
ANSWER to 1 with Jury Demand by Top Docs, Inc. (Sudbeck, Roger)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Sudbeck on behalf of Top Docs, Inc. (Sudbeck, Roger)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Thu 08/29 9:48 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 8/29/2024. (CR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 motion Extend Wed 08/28 5:47 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend re1 Complaint by The United States of America. (Hofmann, Michaele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Grant Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint
Thursday, August 15, 2024
11 11 service Certificate of Service (attorney use) Thu 08/15 5:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier re8 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Viola and To Serve By Publication . (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Thu 08/15 5:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re8 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Viola and To Serve By Publication filed by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter dated April 25, 2023 from Greg Bernard,
Att: 2 Exhibit Email dated July 20, 2023,
Att: 3 Exhibit Email dated June 4, 2024 to Greg Bernard,
Att: 4 Exhibit Letter dated July 11, 2024 to Greg Bernard,
Att: 5 Exhibit Email dated August 2, 2024 with Summons and Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit Email dated August 12, 2024 to Greg Bernard
9 9 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Thu 08/15 5:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Viola and To Serve By Publication filed by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extend Thu 08/15 5:32 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Viola and To Serve By Publication by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele Sanders Hofmann on behalf of The United States of America. (Hofmann, Michaele)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Admission of Service Wed 08/14 3:26 PM
ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on United States on 08-09-24, filed by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Admission of Service Wed 08/14 12:02 PM
ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Tops Docs on 08-12-24, filed by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (Zephier, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 08/02 9:52 AM
Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es) delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (SLT) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/2/2024) (SLT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
3 3 misc Request for Issuance of Summons(es) Wed 07/31 5:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (JMS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Receipt Wed 07/31 5:16 PM
RECEIPT for Filing Fee (JMS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 07/31 5:16 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405.00 fee paid, receipt# 50000827, in shell case on 07/31/2024 filed by Thea J McCauley, David J Pourier. (JMS)
Related: [-]