New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Sanket J Bulsara
Case #: 1:24-cv-04259
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 15, 2024 4:56 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Peter Khaim
Represented By
Wing K. Chiu
Mestechkin Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Oleg A. Mestechkin
Mestechkin Law Group P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Jonathan Gavrielof
Represented By
Matin Emouna
Matin Emouna,, Esq.
contact info
Cross Claimant
Jonathan Gavrielof
Represented By
Matin Emouna
Matin Emouna,, Esq.
contact info
Cross Defendant
David Fernandez
Cross Defendant
Island Pharmacy & Discount Corp.
Cross Defendant
Akbar Grant
Cross Defendant
Jonathan Gavrielof
Represented By
Matin Emouna
Matin Emouna,, Esq.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Galaxy RX Inc.
Cross Defendant
Foster Media Pharmaceutical Supply Corp.
Cross Defendant
Foster Media Group, Inc.
Cross Defendant
J&M Medical Supply Inc.
Cross Defendant
Dynamic Pharmaceuticals Supply, Inc.
Cross Defendant
Dynamic Pharmaceutical Supply Inc.
Cross Defendant
Christy Corvalan
Cross Defendant
Bless You Rx Inc.
Cross Defendant
Best Scripts LLC
Cross Defendant
Dezyre Baez
Cross Defendant
Rachel Aminov
Cross Defendant
Boris Aminov
Cross Defendant
71st RX Pharmacy Inc.
Cross Defendant
Northwest Pharmaceutical & Medical Supply Inc.
Cross Defendant
River Chemists Corp.
Represented By
Kristina Giyaur
Sauchik & Giyaur P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
Pure Gear Consulting, Inc.
Cross Defendant
Irina Polvanova
Cross Defendant
Pharmaceutical Way, Inc.
Cross Defendant
Antonio Payano
Cross Defendant
Park Avenue Pharmaceutical Corp.
Cross Defendant
Onliner Marketing Corp.
Cross Defendant
Ivan Ohar
Cross Defendant
New Line of Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Cross Defendant
Merric Billing Inc.
Cross Defendant
Crystal Medina
Cross Defendant
Peter Khaim
Represented By
Wing K. Chiu
Mestechkin Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Oleg A. Mestechkin
Mestechkin Law Group P.C.
contact info
Cross Defendant
JFK Wholesale and Retail Medical Supply Corp.
Cross Defendant
Y&S Statistic Medical Supply Inc.
Cross Defendant
Y&S Statistic Medical Suply Inc
Cross Defendant
Roman Shamalov
Represented By
Michael Vanunu
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Kenneth Charles Murphy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Roman Shamalov
Represented By
Michael Vanunu
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Kenneth Charles Murphy
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dynamic Pharmaceutical Supply Inc.
Defendant
Island Pharmacy & Discount Corp.
Defendant
Akbar Grant
Defendant
Jonathan Gavrielof
Represented By
Matin Emouna
Matin Emouna,, Esq.
contact info
Defendant
Galaxy RX Inc.
Defendant
Foster Media Pharmaceutical Supply Corp.
Defendant
Foster Media Group, Inc.
Defendant
David Fernandez
Defendant
Dynamic Pharmaceuticals Supply, Inc.
Defendant
Y&S Statistic Medical Suply Inc
Defendant
Christy Corvalan
Defendant
Bless You Rx Inc.
Defendant
Best Scripts LLC
Defendant
Dezyre Baez
Defendant
Rachel Aminov
Defendant
Boris Aminov
60 Oceana Drive West Apt. 10D
Brooklyn, NY 11235
Defendant
71st RX Pharmacy Inc.
Defendant
JFK Wholesale and Retail Medical Supply Corp.
Defendant
Y&S Statistic Medical Supply Inc.
Defendant
River Chemists Corp.
Represented By
Kristina Giyaur
Sauchik & Giyaur P.C.
contact info
Lachlan Tyler
Sauchik & Giyaur, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Pure Gear Consulting, Inc.
Defendant
Irina Polvanova
8274 166th Street
Jamaica, NY 11432
Represented By
Mark N. Parry
Moses & Singer, L.L.P.
contact info
Christopher Kim
Moses & Singer LLP
contact info
Robert S. Wolf
Moses & Singer, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pharmaceutical Way, Inc.
Defendant
Antonio Payano
Defendant
Park Avenue Pharmaceutical Corp.
Defendant
Onliner Marketing Corp.
Defendant
Ivan Ohar
Defendant
Northwest Pharmaceutical & Medical Supply Inc.
Defendant
New Line of Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Defendant
Merric Billing Inc.
Defendant
Crystal Medina
Defendant
Peter Khaim
Represented By
Wing K. Chiu
Mestechkin Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Matthew J. Conroy
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Robert E. B. Hewitt, III
Schwartz, Conroy & Hack, PC
contact info
Oleg A. Mestechkin
Mestechkin Law Group P.C.
contact info
Defendant
J&M Medical Supply Inc.
Mediator
Richard Crisona
Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP 111 Broadway, 20th Floor
New York, NY 10006
Plaintiff
Gilead Sciences, LLC
Represented By
Angelica H Nguyen
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Potter
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Timothy Alan Waters
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Anna Blum
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Andrew I Haddad
contact info
Maxwell Kendall Weiss
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Thomas Philip Kurland
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By
Angelica H Nguyen
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Potter
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Timothy Alan Waters
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Anna Blum
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Andrew I Haddad
contact info
Maxwell Kendall Weiss
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Thomas Philip Kurland
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilead Sciences Ireland UC
Represented By
Angelica H Nguyen
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Potter
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Timothy Alan Waters
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Anna Blum
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Andrew I Haddad
contact info
Maxwell Kendall Weiss
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
contact info
Thomas Philip Kurland
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler
contact info

GPO Oct 12 2024
ORDER denying 115 133. For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, Ms. Polvanova's Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 10/12/2024. (JAM)
GPO Nov 05 2024
OPINION AND ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 11/5/2024. (EG)
GPO Dec 22 2024
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Dkt. No. 154 and Dkt. No. 169, for the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order. Gilead and Ms. Polvanova shall comply with the deadlines set in the attached Opinion and Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 12/22/2024. (JAM)
GPO Mar 12 2025
ORDER: So ordered 195, per the attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 3/12/2025. (EG)
GPO Apr 21 2025
OPINION AND ORDER - For the reasons set forth in the attached Opinion and Order, the Court grants Gilead's motion 197. The Court orders that, within thirty days of the date of this order, Defendant shall comply with the subpoena and produce all non-privileged documents and information sufficient to show (1) the source of all payments from or on behalf of Defendant to Moses & Singer since commencement of her representation in the Criminal Action; and (2) the dates and amounts of all payments from or on behalf of Defendant received by Moses & Singer since commencement of her representation in the Criminal Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 4/21/2025. (EG)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
214 214 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 05/02 4:33 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Judge Marutollo's Order Granting Gilead's Motion to Compel or, in the alternative submission of Ms. Polvanova's formal objection by Irina Polvanova. (Kim, Christopher)
Related: [-]
213 213 misc Status Report Fri 05/02 12:01 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC (Potter, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
212 212 motion Permanent Injunction Fri 05/02 11:50 AM
MOTION for Permanent Injunction and Consent Judgment as to Defendant Irena Polvanova by Gilead Sciences Ireland UC, Gilead Sciences, Inc., Gilead Sciences, LLC. (Potter, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/30 10:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo: A status conference was held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on April 30, 2025 between Plaintiffs and Defendant Irina Polvanova ("the parties"). The parties continue to make strong progress towards a complete resolution. The parties shall file a joint status report regarding settlement by 12 p.m. EST on May 2, 2025. (NOT RECORDED.) (EG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/28 12:59 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo: An in-person continued settlement conference was held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on April 28, 2025 between Plaintiffs and Defendant Irina Polvanova ("the parties"). All parties appeared. In light of the significant progress made at the April 28, 2025 conference, the Court orders the parties to appear via telephone for a brief status conference on April 30, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall call (646) 828-7666; Meeting ID: 160 628 5086; Passcode: 081350. Additionally, to the extent necessary, the parties shall submit any supplemental ex parte settlement letters to Judge Marutollo's chambers via email (marutollo_chambers@nyed.uscourts.gov) by 5 p.m. April 29, 2025. (NOT RECORDED.) (EG)
Related: [-]