New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-08195
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
TRUEACCORD CORP.
Plaintiff
KEVIN TEJEDA
Represented By
ELLIOT ELO
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Wed 09/25 12:53 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 11/25/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 9/24/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Settlement (aty) Mon 09/23 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by KEVIN TEJEDA (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/17 11:31 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEVIN TEJEDA. TRUEACCORD CORP. served on 8/15/2024, answer due 9/5/2024. (ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 08/06 2:27 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to TRUEACCORD CORP.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/31 10:49 PM
COMPLAINT against TRUEACCORD CORP. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15559158) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KEVIN TEJEDA.(ELO, ELLIOT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/01 1:33 PM
Case assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr)
Related: [-]