Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Scott L Palk
Case #: 5:24-cv-00784
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 2:29 AM CST
Defendant
Paul Klein
Represented By
Douglas J Sorocco
Dunlap Codding Pc - Oklahoma City
contact info
Jeannie Pinkston
Dunlap Codding, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stillwater Designs and Audio Inc
Represented By
Kelsey N Frobisher Schremmer
Overman Legal Group
contact info
J Blake Johnson
Overman Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 59 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
20 20 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 12:38 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Paul Klein. (Pinkston, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/31 9:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER : Pursuant to the provisions of the Status/Scheduling Conference Docket filed herein, the Court has determined that a formal Status/Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The Status/Scheduling Conference scheduled for 2/5/2025 is hereby STRICKEN, and the following scheduling deadlines are entered: Motions to join due within 30 days of the date of this Order; Motions to amend due within 30 days of the date of this Order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 6/2/2025; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 14 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 6/2/2025; Dft witness list due 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 6/16/2025; Dft exhibit list due 6/23/2025; Motions in limine due 8/1/2025; Jury instructions due 8/1/2025; Voir dire requests due 8/1/2025; Trial briefs due 8/1/2025; Discovery due by 8/1/2025. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom 304 before Judge Scott L. Palk. Dispositive & Daubert Motions due by 7/1/2025. Pretrial Report due by 8/1/2025. Case will be referred for a judicial settlement conference after 5/1/2025. Entered at the direction of Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/31/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/31 8:59 AM
ORDER denying12 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 1/31/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
17 17 misc Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan Wed 01/29 3:52 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Stillwater Designs and Audio Inc, Defendant Paul Klein. (Frobisher Schremmer, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
16 16 misc Docket Mon 01/06 11:03 AM
STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET : Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2025 09:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/29/2025. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/30 10:03 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by Paul Klein. (Pinkston, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/23 2:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss Partial filed by All Plaintiffs. (Johnson, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Mon 12/02 8:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Paul Klein.(Pinkston, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 12/02 7:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Partial by Paul Klein. (Pinkston, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/12 10:10 AM
ORDER granting9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to1 Complaint on or before 12/2/2024. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 11/12/2024. (llg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
10 10 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 11/11 11:24 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jeannie Pinkston on behalf of Paul Klein (Pinkston, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 10, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Sun 11/10 6:44 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Paul Klein. (Sorocco, Douglas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Sun 11/10 6:41 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Douglas J Sorocco on behalf of Paul Klein (Sorocco, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/01 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stillwater Designs and Audio Inc. All Defendants. (Frobisher Schremmer, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
6 6 service Subpoena Returned Executed Mon 09/30 3:21 PM
(STRICKEN by 9/30/2024 Notice from the Court) SUBPOENA Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs as to Paul Klein. (Frobisher Schremmer, Kelsey) Modified on 9/30/2024 (llg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice from the Court Mon 09/30 3:34 PM
NOTICE from the Court STRIKING6 Subpoena Returned Executed, as the incorrect event was used. Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED to refile the document using the event for "Summons Returned Executed." (llg)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 08/02 5:16 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Paul Klein. (ekw)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 08/02 4:25 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kelsey N Frobisher Schremmer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Frobisher Schremmer, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 08/02 4:24 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by J Blake Johnson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Johnson, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
misc Payment for a Civil Case Thu 08/01 9:35 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4487613. (Johnson, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice ~Notice (other) Wed 07/31 5:19 PM
NOTICE: AO 120 form mailed to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office P.O. Box 1450 Alexandria, VA 22313 (ekw)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/31 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Paul Klein filed by Stillwater Designs and Audio Inc.(ekw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet