Oklahoma Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00265
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Aug 01, 2024 2:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Guadalupe Blas (3)
Represented By
Erin O'Roke Oakley
Hartzog Conger Cason LLP
contact info
Amber B Martin
Martin Law Office-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Bryan Mauricio Ortiz (1)
Represented By
John A L Campbell
Aston Mathis Campbell Clarke & Tiger, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Shobe (2)
Represented By
Andrew M Casey
Hendrick, Casey, & Hutter
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Travis Leverett
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/01/2024 3:28 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz (1), Guadalupe Blas (2), Joshua Shobe (3). (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet Bryan Mauricio Ortiz,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet Guadalupe Blas,
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet Joshua Shobe
5 5 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Bryan Mauricio Ortiz (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL John A L Campbell for Bryan Mauricio Ortiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz held on 6/18/2024, Detention Hearing set for 6/21/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/21/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
8 8 DPPA-ORDER as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
10 10 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Guadalupe Blas (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Amber B Martin for Guadalupe Blas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
12 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Guadalupe Blas held on 6/18/2024, Detention Hearing set for 6/24/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/24/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
13 13 DPPA-ORDER as to Guadalupe Blas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Guadalupe Blas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
15 15 ** SEALED DOCUMENT ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joshua Shobe (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Andrew M Casey for Joshua Shobe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
17 17 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Initial Appearance as to Joshua Shobe held on 6/18/2024, Detention Hearing set for 6/21/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/21/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
18 18 DPPA-ORDER as to Joshua Shobe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Joshua Shobe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/18/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
20 20 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Guadalupe Blas Detention Hearing set for 6/24/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Preliminary Examination set for 6/24/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 103 before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. (ac) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
22 22 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joshua Shobe. Detention Hearing set for 6/21/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/21/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
23 23 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz. Detention Hearing set for 6/21/2024 1:30 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Preliminary Hearing set for 6/21/2024 1:30 PM in Courtroom 102 before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
25 25 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amber B Martin appearing for Guadalupe Blas (Martin, Amber) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
27 27 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Preliminary Hearing as to Joshua Shobe held on 6/21/2024. The Court found probable cause. Detention Hearing as to Joshua Shobe held on 6/21/2024. Defendant detained pending trial. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
28 28 ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 06/18/2024 in case as to Joshua Shobe. (kb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
29 29 ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 06/18/2024 in case as to Guadalupe Blas. (kb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
30 30 ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 06/18/2024 in case as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz. (kb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
31 31 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell: Preliminary Hearing as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz waived on 6/21/2024, Detention Hearing as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz withdrawn on 6/21/2024. Defendant released on unsecured bond with conditions of release. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
32 32 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Bryan Mauricio Ortiz (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
33 33 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/21/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
34 34 Appearance Bond as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz (1) $5,000.00 Unsecured. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/21/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
35 35 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Joshua Shobe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 6/21/24. (lb) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
36 36 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin:Preliminary Hearing as to Guadalupe Blas waived on 6/24/2024. Detention Hearing as to Guadalupe Blas held on 6/24/2024. (ac) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
37 37 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Guadalupe Blas (2) 5000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 6/24/2024. (ac) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
38 38 Appearance Bond as to Guadalupe Blas (2) 5000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 6/24/2024. (ac) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
39 39 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Guadalupe Blas (ac) [5:24-mj-00515-SM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
40 40 INDICTMENT as to Bryan Mauricio Ortiz (1) count(s) 1, 2, 5, 6, 7, 8-9, and Criminal Forfeiture, Joshua Shobe (2) count(s) 1, 3, and Criminal Forfeiture, Guadalupe Blas (3) count(s) 1, 4, and Criminal Forfeiture. (naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet 1 - Bryan Mauricio Ortiz,
Att: 2 1 pgs Criminal Cover Sheet 2 - Joshua Shobe,
Att: 3 Criminal Cover Sheet 3 - Guadalupe Blas