Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Leslie Hoffman Price
Case #: 6:24-cv-01413
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Mauro Zelaya
2314 Enfield Court
Orlando, FL 32837
Plaintiff
Superior Pool Products LLC
a foreign limited liability company c/o Angela Grewal 501 Riverside Ave, Suite 601
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Represented By
Angela Neyer Grewal
Adams & Reese, LLP
contact info
Joshua Gostel
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SCP Distributors LLC
a foreign limited liability company 109 Northpark Blvd
Convington, LA 70433
Represented By
Angela Neyer Grewal
Adams & Reese, LLP
contact info
Joshua Gostel
Adams And Reese LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
23 23 motion Default - Default Judgment Mon 01/13 2:25 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Mauro Zelaya by SCP Distributors LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC.(Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Correspondence,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Non-Military Service
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 12/10 8:00 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Mauro Zelaya. (ECJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Mon 12/09 4:50 PM
ORDER granting 20 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Entry of Default By Clerk. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter default against Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 12/9/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
20 20 motion Default - Clerks Entry of Default Tue 11/19 2:09 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Mauro Zelaya by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC.(Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Affidavit of Non-Military Service,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Corr to Zelaya
Monday, November 18, 2024
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/18 1:22 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/18/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/14 2:06 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically 30 Day Extension by Mauro Zelaya. (e-portal) (ARL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Tue 11/05 4:51 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 15 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default By Clerk. A renewed motion, which shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of this Order, must fully comply with all applicable Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/5/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Response to order to show cause Tue 11/05 4:06 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 12 Order to show cause filed by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC. (Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Default - Clerks Entry of Default Tue 11/05 4:05 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against Mauro Zelaya by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC.(Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Non-Military Service
Friday, November 01, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/01 4:39 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 13 Defendant's Request for Additional Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price on 11/1/2024. (MKH)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/01 3:22 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically extension of Time to Acquire Counsel by Mauro Zelaya. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
12 12 order Order to show cause Wed 10/30 10:08 AM
ENDORSED ORDER directing Plaintiffs to SHOW CAUSE within seven days from the date of this Order as to why this case should not be dismissed for failing to apply for default against Defendant in accordance with Local Rule 1.10(b). Alternatively, Plaintiffs may cure their failure by applying for default within seven days, thereby discharging the order to show cause. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/30/2024. (MEH)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
11 11 service Summons returned executed Fri 08/09 10:03 AM
RETURN of service executed on 8/7/2024 by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC as to Mauro Zelaya.(Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Return of Service
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 08/07 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Angela Neyer Grewal on behalf of SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC. Lead Counsel: Angela N. Grewal. (Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/07 11:23 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SCP Distributors LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pool Corporation for SCP Distributors LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC. (Grewal, Angela) Modified docket text on 8/7/2024 (SET)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 08/07 11:22 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/07 11:20 AM
NOTICE by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC of Pendency of Other Actions (Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
6 6 order Order Tue 08/06 2:47 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/6/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/06 2:47 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/6/2024. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued Mon 08/05 11:32 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Mauro Zelaya. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/01 3:45 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:24-cv-1413-CEM-LHP. (TNP)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/01 10:30 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pool Corporation for SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC.. (Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Mauro Zelaya (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22360081) filed by SCP DISTRIBUTORS LLC, Superior Pool Products LLC.(Grewal, Angela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons