New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-05854
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Infinity Painting Co., Inc
Defendant
Frank Nani,
Plaintiff
Jenny Coronel Bonilla
Represented By
Joshua Levin-Epstein
Levin-Epstein & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/14 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Levin-Epstein on behalf of Jenny Coronel Bonilla..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/15 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eunon Jason Mizrahi on behalf of Jenny Coronel Bonilla..(Mizrahi, Eunon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/27 6:04 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Infinity Painting Co., Inc served on 8/14/2024, answer due 9/4/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Jenny Coronel Bonilla..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/02 2:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 08/02 1:45 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Infinity Painting Co., Inc, Frank Nani. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 08/02 1:37 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code Blank; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act; the County code has been modified to Kings. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/02 1:38 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Joshua Levin-Epstein to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated May 28, 2024. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated May 28, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated May 28, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 08/02 1:40 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 08/02 1:40 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 08/02 1:40 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 08/01 1:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frank Nani, and Infinity Painting Co., Inc.,, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jenny Coronel Bonilla..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/01 1:08 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua) Modified on 8/2/2024 (vf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent to Sue Thu 08/01 1:06 PM
CONSENT TO SUE. Document filed by Jenny Coronel Bonilla..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 1:05 PM
COMPLAINT against Infinity Painting Co., Inc, Frank Nani,. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29689323)Document filed by Jenny Coronel Bonilla..(Levin-Epstein, Joshua)
Related: [-]